City of San Jose, California et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Black Alliance For Just Immigration, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, City of San Jose, California, Zerihoun Yilma, Arlington County, Virginia, Santcha Etienne, Rodney Ellis, Xavier Becerra, Harris County, Texas and State of California
Defendant: Cheryl L Johnson, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, Steven Dillingham, U.S. Census Bureau and U.S. Department of Commerce
Amicus Curiae: Libby Garland, Ron Wyden, Steven Ruggles, U.S. House of Representatives, Rachel Buff, Mazie K. Hirono, Natalia Molina, Richard Blumenthal, Sherrod Brown, Brian Schatz, Elizabeth Warren, Cory A. Booker, The League of Women Voters, Jeffrey A. Merkley, Margo Anderson, Erika Lee, Dianne Feinstein, J. Morgan Kousser, Andrew Beveridge and Immigration Reform Law Institute
Case Number: 5:2020cv05167
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Richard R Clifton
2 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
3 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 87 Declaration of Shannon D. Lankenau in Support of #86 Reply to Opposition/Response,, filed byArlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #86 ) (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 86 REPLY (re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) and in Opposition to Defendants' #84 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byArlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Expert Declaration of Andrew Reamer, Ph.D., #2 Declaration of Dwight Dively, #3 Declaration of Michelle Ramsey, #4 Declaration of Umair A. Shah, M.D., M.P.H., #5 Supplemental Declaration of Rodney Ellis, #6 Declaration of Gabrielle D. Boutin)(Bress, Richard) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 15, 2020 Filing 85 Brief re #84 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 63), #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Amicus Brief in Support of Defs filed byImmigration Reform Law Institute. (Related document(s) #84 , #63 ) (Joseph, Lawrence) (Filed on 9/15/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 63) filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/21/2020. Replies due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John M. Abowd, #2 Declaration Declaration of Albert E. Fontenot)(Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine I. Green of Dustin Chase-Woods (Green, Blaine) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Pisko ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14893916.) filed by The League of Women Voters. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Certificate of Good Standing)(Pisko, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine I. Green (Green, Blaine) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 79 Brief re #63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byThe League of Women Voters. (Related document(s) #63 ) (Green, Blaine) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 78 Brief ("Brief of Amici Curiae Historians in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment") filed byMargo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalia Molina, Steven Ruggles. (Clary, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 77 Certificate of Interested Entities by Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalia Molina, Steven Ruggles (Clary, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara Irene Devitt (Devitt, Tamara) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Clary (Clary, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14888633.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/01/2020 filed by Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalia Molina, Steven Ruggles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (Texas))(Trachtenberg, Mark) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 72 Brief Amici Curiae of Members of Congress filed byBrian Schatz, Richard Blumenthal, Cory A. Booker, Sherrod Brown, Dianne Feinstein, Mazie K. Hirono, Jeffrey A. Merkley, Elizabeth Warren, Ron Wyden. (Wydra, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter / [Corrected] Notice of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 69 Brief / Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs filed byU.S. House of Representatives. (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881515.) filed by The League of Women Voters. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Altman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (40) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in cases 5:20-cv-05169-LHK-RRC-EMC and 5:20-cv-05167-LHK-RRC-EMC. Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-05169-LHK-RRC-EMC, 5:20-cv-05167-LHK-RRC-EMC(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14879975.) filed by The League of Women Voters. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rivaux, Shani) (Filed on 8/31/2020) Modified on 9/1/2020 (lhklc3, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2020 Filing 64 Declaration of Shannon D. Lankenau in Support of #63 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byArlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35)(Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/10/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Ruth Gilgenbach, Ph.D., #3 Declaration of Matthew A. Barreto, Ph.D, #4 Declaration of Nana Gyamfi, #5 Declaration of Sam Liccardo, #6 Declaration of Zerihoun Yilma, #7 Declaration of Rodney Ellis)(Bress, Richard) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order Granting Stipulation to Permit Filing of Amicus Briefs. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/27/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 61 STIPULATION to Permit Filing of Amicus Briefs (Joint) filed by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Bress, Richard) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 60 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-18-20, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (53 in 5:20-cv-05167-LHK-RRC-EMC) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2020. (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order Adopting Previous Orders and Delegating Pro Hac Vice Motions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order Regarding Joint Stipulation Regarding Topics for Early Dispositive Briefings and Responsive Pleading Deadlines by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (52) Stipulation in case 5:20-cv-05167-LHK. Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-05167-LHK, 5:20-cv-05169-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge Lucy H. Koh. The Court RELATES Case No. 5:20-cv-05799-NC, National Urban League et al v. Ross et al, to Case Nos. 5:20-cv-05167-LHK, City of San Jose, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al, and 5:20-cv-05169 LHK, State of California, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al. The Clerk shall reassign National Urban League et al v. Ross et al to Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CORRECTED ORDER designating United States District Court composed of three judges pursuant to Section 2284, Title 28 United States Code. Effective 8/19/2020, the Honorable Richard R. Clifton, United States Circuit Judge for the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, and the Honorable Edward M. Chen, United States District Judge for the Northern District of California, to sit with the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Chief Judge Sidney R. Thomas, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ***FILED IN ERROR - See ECF 56 for Correction*** ORDER designating United States District Court composed of three judges pursuant to Section 2284, Title 28 United States Code. Effective 8/19/2020, the Honorable Richard R. Clifton, United States Circuit Judge for the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, and the Honorable Edward M. Chen, United States District Judge for the Northern District of California, to sit with the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Chief Judge Sidney R. Thomas, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 8/20/2020 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/18/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 18, 2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Topics for Early Dispositive Briefings and Responsive Pleading Deadlines (Joint) filed by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Rodney Ellis, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sadik Huseny, #2 Proposed Order)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/18/2020 from 10:37 AM - 11:37 AM (1 hour). The August 18, 2020 Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information and deadlines from the Conference. Total Time in Court: 1 hour. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. For Plaintiffs: Richard Bress; Sadik Huseny; Steven Bauer; Amit Makker; Shannon D. Lankenau; Ezra Rosenberg; Matthew Wise; Gabrielle Downey Boutin; Maria Bee; and Keith A. Yeomans. For Defendants: Brad Rosenberg and Dan Mauler. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/18/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 49 Request to the Chief Judge of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit to Convene a Three-Judge Court Under 28 U.S.C. 2284. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/18/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 47 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 5:20-cv-05799 NC with 5:20-cv-05167 LHK and 5:20-cv-05169 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/18/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Filed byLovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, City of San Jose, California, Zerihoun Yilma, Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, Sam Liccardo, Santcha Etienne, Harris County, Texas, Rodney Ellis. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14828131.) filed by Xavier Becerra, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, State of California, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Clarke, Kristen) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 44 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Relating Cases and Requiring Parties to File Consolidated Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/14/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 14, 2020 Filing 42 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Relate Case 3:20-cv-05169 State of California, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al ) filed bySteven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 8/14/2020)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Mauler on behalf of Federal Defendants (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 39 **CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING** The Initial Case Management Conference is set for August 18, 2020 at 10:30 AM before the Hon. Lucy H. Koh via ZOOM Webinar video. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to LHKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than 8/17/2020 at 12:00 pm PST. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618399532?pwd=aklxUFF6TFFpYm10WHppUnZqUUo1dz09Meeting ID: 161 839 9532Password: 919880Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2020) Modified on 8/17/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Advancing Case Management Conference and Setting Deadline for Government Response to Motion to Relate.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY (re #33 MOTION to Shorten Time for Initial Case Management Conference ) filed byArlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amit Makker, #2 Exhibit A)(Bauer, Steven) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 11, 2020 Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #33 MOTION to Shorten Time for Initial Case Management Conference ) filed bySteven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 8/11/2020)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Requiring Appearance. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/10/2020. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) Modified on 8/11/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14794415.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jordan, Maryum) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Shorten Time for Initial Case Management Conference filed by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sadik Huseny, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order, #10 Proof of Service)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 29 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Dorian Spence ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14786846.) filed by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, King County, Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Spence, Dorian) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 6, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14785510.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Saini, Ajay) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zerihoun Yilma, Arlington County, Virginia, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo. U.S. Census Bureau served on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zerihoun Yilma, Arlington County, Virginia, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo. Steven Dillingham served on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zerihoun Yilma, Arlington County, Virginia, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo. U.S. Department of Commerce served on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zerihoun Yilma, Arlington County, Virginia, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo. Wilbur L. Ross served on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zerihoun Yilma, Arlington County, Virginia, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo. Donald J. Trump served on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Cheryl L. Johnson, in her Official Capacity as the Clerk of the United States House of Representatives, Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14768639.) filed by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rosenberg, Ezra) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #12 MOTION to Relate Case 3:20-cv-05169 State of California, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al ) filed byArlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Black Alliance For Just Immigration, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Black Alliance For Just Immigration (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for October 28, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy Guan on behalf of Plaintiffs City of San Jose, California; King County, Washington; Arlington County, Virginia; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Sam Liccardo; Zerihoun Yilma; and Lovette Kargbo-Thompson (Guan, Cindy) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Danielle Lankenau on behalf of Plaintiffs City of San Jose, California; King County, Washington; Arlington County, Virginia; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Sam Liccardo; Zerihoun Yilma; and Lovette Kargbo-Thompson (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Amit Makker on behalf of Plaintiffs City of San Jose, California; King County, Washington; Arlington County, Virginia; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Sam Liccardo; Zerihoun Yilma; and Lovette Kargbo-Thompson (Makker, Amit) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Bauer on behalf of Plaintiffs City of San Jose, California; King County, Washington; Arlington County, Virginia; Black Alliance for Just Immigration; Sam Liccardo; Zerihoun Yilma; and Lovette Kargbo-Thompson (Bauer, Steven) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Relate Case 3:20-cv-05169 State of California, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al filed by State of California, Xavier Becerra. (Wise, R.) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma.. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/11/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #3 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Richard P. Bress Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Steven Dillingham, Cheryl L Johnson, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/11/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Greenbaum (Greenbaum, Jon) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14741547.) filed by Arlington County, Virginia, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Sam Liccardo, Zerihoun Yilma. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Bress, Richard) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 7/27/2020)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Steven Dillingham, Cheryl L Johnson, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14741535.). Filed byZerihoun Yilma, Arlington County, Virginia, Lovette Kargbo-Thompson, King County, Washington, Black Alliance For Just Immigration, City of San Jose, California, Sam Liccardo. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huseny, Sadik) (Filed on 7/27/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of San Jose, California et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Alliance For Just Immigration
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Dorian Lawrence Spence
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Cindy Guan
Represented By: Maryum Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: King County, Washington
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Dorian Lawrence Spence
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Cindy Guan
Represented By: Maryum Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Liccardo
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Cindy Guan
Represented By: Maryum Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lovette Kargbo-Thompson
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Cindy Guan
Represented By: Maryum Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of San Jose, California
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Dorian Lawrence Spence
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Cindy Guan
Represented By: Maryum Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zerihoun Yilma
Represented By: Jon Greenbaum
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Ajay P Saini
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Cindy Guan
Represented By: Maryum Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlington County, Virginia
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Amit Makker
Represented By: Steven Mark Bauer
Represented By: Dorian Lawrence Spence
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Cindy Guan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santcha Etienne
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Ellis
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harris County, Texas
Represented By: Richard P. Bress
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Sadik Harry Huseny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Kristen Clarke
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur L. Ross
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dillingham
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Census Bureau
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Commerce
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Libby Garland
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ron Wyden
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steven Ruggles
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. House of Representatives
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rachel Buff
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mazie K. Hirono
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Natalia Molina
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard Blumenthal
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sherrod Brown
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brian Schatz
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elizabeth Warren
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cory A. Booker
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The League of Women Voters
Represented By: Blaine I. Green
Represented By: Dustin James Chase-Woods
Represented By: Michael John Pisko
Represented By: Shani Rivaux
Represented By: Jennifer G Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeffrey A. Merkley
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Margo Anderson
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Erika Lee
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dianne Feinstein
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: J. Morgan Kousser
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andrew Beveridge
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?