State of California et al v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: City Of Oakland, Los Angeles Unified School District, City of Long Beach, State of California, City of Los Angeles, Xavier Becerra and County of Los Angeles
Defendant: U.S. Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, Steven Dillingham and U.S. Department of Commerce
Amicus Curiae: Libby Garland, Ron Wyden, Steven Ruggles, U.S. House of Representatives, Rachel Buff, Mazie K. Hirono, Natalia Molina, Richard Blumenthal, Sherrod Brown, Elizabeth Warren, Dianne Feinstein, Cory A. Booker, The League of Women Voters, Jeffrey A. Merkley, Margo Anderson, Erika Lee, Brian Schatz, J. Morgan Kousser and Andrew Beveridge
Case Number: 5:2020cv05169
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Richard R Clifton
2 Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
3 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
4 Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER of USCA as to #85 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by U.S. Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Department of Commerce, Steven Dillingham, Donald J. Trump. Appellants unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Order Dismissing Cases for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed on 1/7/2021. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER of United States Supreme Court: The judgment is vacated, and the case is remanded to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California with instructions to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER OF USCA as to #85 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Department of Commerce, Steven Dillingham, Donald J. Trump. Appellants unopposed motion to stay appellate proceedings is granted. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. Appellate proceedings are stayed until resolution of Trump v. City of San Jose, Sup. Ct. Dkt. No. 20-561, or until further order of this court. Appellants shall file a status report on February 8, 2021 and every 90 days thereafter while resolution of Trump v. City of San Jose is pending. Status reports should include any change in the status of Trump v. City of San Jose and the estimated date of resolution, if known. Appellants shall notify the court by filing a status report within 7 days of the resolution of Trump v. City of San Jose. Failure to file a status report may terminate the stay of appellate proceedings. The briefing schedule will be reset in a future order. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order Granting (109) Stipulation to Enlarge Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-05167-LHK-RRC-EMC, 5:20-cv-05169-LHK-RRC-EMC (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed by Xavier Becerra, State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 11/5/2020) Modified on 11/9/2020 (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2020 Filing 89 USCA Case Number 20-561 Supreme Court of the United States for #84 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Department of Commerce, Steven Dillingham, Donald J. Trump. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #81 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #80 Motion for Leave to File Statement of Recent Development. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 86 USCA Case Number 20-17105 9th Circuit Court of Appeals for #85 Notice of Appeal, filed by U.S. Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Department of Commerce, Steven Dillingham, Donald J. Trump. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Appeal of Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #82 , Order #83 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit (Robinson, John) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Supreme Court of the United States filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Appeal of Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #82 , Order #83 (Appeal fee FEE WAIVED.) (Robinson, John) (Filed on 10/23/2020) Modified text on 10/23/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2020 Copy of Notice of Appeal e-mailed to Supreme Court. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 83 Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 10/22/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order granting (63) Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-05167-LHK-RRC-EMC, 5:20-cv-05169-LHK-RRC-EMC(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 81 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Response to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Xavier Becerra, State of California. Responses due by 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 80 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Statement of Recent Development Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3(d) filed by Xavier Becerra, State of California. Responses due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supreme Court stay order, #2 Exhibit B - Census Bureau Statement)(Robinson, John) (Filed on 10/14/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 78 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/08/2020, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (77 in 5:20-cv-05169-LHK-RRC-EMC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2021. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/8/2020 before Judge Richard R. Clifton, Judge Edward M. Chen, and Judge Lucy H. Koh for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 76 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/8/2020 before Judge Richard R. Clifton by Xavier Becerra, State of California, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard R. Clifton, Judge Edward M. Chen, and Judge Lucy H. Koh: Hearing on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss held on October 8, 2020 from 1:31 PM - 2:40 PM (1 hour, 9 minutes). Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 9 minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. For Plaintiffs: Richard Bress and Matthew Wise. For Defendants: Sopan Joshi. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 74 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Robinson, John) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by John Robinson (Robinson, John) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 72 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bee, Maria) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 71 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Holtzman, David) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 70 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for City of Long Beach (Kilaita, Monica) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 69 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Los Angeles Unified School District (Salmon Evans, Sue) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of Counsel ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL by Gabrielle Downey Boutin on behalf of Xavier Becerra, State of California (Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 67 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Plaintiff, City of Los Angeles) (Flores, Valerie) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 66 CLERK'S NOTICE CONFIRMING OCTOBER 8, 2020 HEARING VIA ZOOM. The motion hearing remains as set on Thursday, October 8, 2020 at 1:30 PM. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephon e or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appellants' Supreme Court Supplemental Brief)(Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 5, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Sopan Joshi (Joshi, Sopan) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 29, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #63 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by U.S. Census Bureau, Wilbur L. Ross, U.S. Department of Commerce, Steven Dillingham, Donald J. Trump (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY in Support of ( #61 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and Opposition to #37 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 9/28/2020) Modified on 9/29/2020 linking entry to document #37 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2020 Filing 62 REPLY (re #37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #61 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 37) ) filed byXavier Becerra, State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration)(Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 37) filed by Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/21/2020. Replies due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John M. Abowd, #2 Declaration Declaration of Albert E. Fontenot)(Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Brad Prescott Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Brad) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine I. Green of Dustin Chase-Woods (Green, Blaine) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaine I. Green (Green, Blaine) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Pisko ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14893829.) filed by The League of Women Voters. (Attachments: #1 Ex A Certificate of Good Standing)(Pisko, Michael) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 55 Brief re #37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byThe League of Women Voters. (Related document(s) #37 ) (Green, Blaine) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 54 Brief ("Brief of Amici Curiae Historians in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment") filed byMargo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalia Molina, Steven Ruggles. (Clary, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 53 Certificate of Interested Entities by Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalia Molina, Steven Ruggles (Clary, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara Irene Devitt (Devitt, Tamara) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Clary (Clary, Richard) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14888763.) filed by Margo Anderson, Andrew Beveridge, Rachel Buff, Libby Garland, J. Morgan Kousser, Erika Lee, Natalia Molina, Steven Ruggles. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (Texas))(Trachtenberg, Mark) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Bee (Bee, Maria) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 47 Brief Amici Curiae of Members of Congress filed byBrian Schatz, Richard Blumenthal, Cory A. Booker, Sherrod Brown, Dianne Feinstein, Mazie K. Hirono, Jeffrey A. Merkley, Elizabeth Warren, Ron Wyden. (Wydra, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of U.S. House of Representatives as Amicus Curiae (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 45 Brief / Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs filed byU.S. House of Representatives. (Letter, Douglas) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14881247.) filed by The League of Women Voters. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Altman, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica J. Kilaita for City of Long Beach (Kilaita, Monica) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (40) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in cases 5:20-cv-05169-LHK-RRC-EMC and 5:20-cv-05167-LHK-RRC-EMC. Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-05169-LHK-RRC-EMC, 5:20-cv-05167-LHK-RRC-EMC(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 31, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14879899.) filed by The League of Women Voters. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rivaux, Shani) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE by Xavier Becerra, State of California of Errata to Declaration of Ruth Gilgenbach, PH.D in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Wise, R.) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 EXHIBITS re #37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byXavier Becerra, State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Lankenau, #2 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Lankenau, #3 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Lankenau, #4 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Lankenau, #5 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Lankenau, #6 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Lankenau, #7 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Lankenau, #8 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Lankenau, #9 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Lankenau, #10 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Lankenau, #11 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Lankenau, #12 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Lankenau, #13 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Lankenau, #14 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Lankenau, #15 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Lankenau, #16 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Lankenau, #17 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Lankenau, #18 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Lankenau, #19 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Lankenau, #20 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Lankenau, #21 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Lankenau, #22 Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Lankenau, #23 Exhibit 24 to Declaration of Lankenau, #24 Exhibit 25 to Declaration of Lankenau, #25 Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Lankenau, #26 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Lankenau, #27 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Lankenau, #28 Exhibit 29 to Declaration of Lankenau, #29 Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Lankenau, #30 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Lankenau, #31 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Lankenau, #32 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Lankenau, #33 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Lankenau, #34 Exhibit 35 to Declaration of Lankenau)(Related document(s) #37 ) (Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 8/28/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Xavier Becerra, State of California. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 9/10/2020. Replies due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gilgenbach, #2 Declaration of Lankenau, #3 Proposed Order)(Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 8/27/2020) Modified Replies due date to 9/21/2020 on 9/1/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Granting Stipulation to Permit Filing of Amicus Briefs. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/27/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 35 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Permit Filings of Amicus Briefs filed by Xavier Becerra, State of California. (Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Louise Flores as Lead Counsel for Plaintiff City of Los Angeles (Flores, Valerie) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 33 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-18-20, before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number e-mail: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (53 in 5:20-cv-05167-LHK-RRC-EMC) Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2020. (lasS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/18/2020 before Judge Lucy H. Koh for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ilan Holtzman Daniel P. Kappes and Jacqueline N. Harvey (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Dundas for Plaintiff City of Los Angeles (Dundas, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Alice Kenealy for Plaintiff City of Los Angeles (Kenealy, Kathleen) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #28 Amended Document filed by State of California, Xavier Becerra (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 28 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Xavier Becerra, State of California. (Wise, R.) (Filed on 8/24/2020) Modified on 8/25/2020 . Incorrect event selected when posting document (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Adopting Previous Orders and Delegating Pro Hac Vice Motions. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Regarding Joint Stipulation Regarding Topics for Early Dispositive Briefings and Responsive Pleading Deadlines by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting (52) Stipulation in case 5:20-cv-05167-LHK. Associated Cases: 5:20-cv-05167-LHK, 5:20-cv-05169-LHK(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RELATING CASES by Judge Lucy H. Koh. The Court RELATES Case No. 5:20-cv-05799-NC, National Urban League et al v. Ross et al, to Case Nos. 5:20-cv-05167-LHK, City of San Jose, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al, and 5:20-cv-05169 LHK, State of California, et al v. Donald J. Trump, et al. The Clerk shall reassign National Urban League et al v. Ross et al to Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 20, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Alexander Yeomans for Plaintiff Los Angeles Unified School District (Yeomans, Keith) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Ann Salmon Evans as Lead Counsel for Plaintiff Los Angeles Unified School District (Salmon Evans, Sue) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CORRECTED ORDER designating United States District Court composed of three judges pursuant to Section 2284, Title 28 United States Code. Effective 8/19/2020, the Honorable Richard R. Clifton, United States Circuit Judge for the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, and the Honorable Edward M. Chen, United States District Judge for the Northern District of California, to sit with the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Chief Judge Sidney R. Thomas, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit.. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ***FILED IN ERROR - See ECF 22 for Correction*** ORDER designating United States District Court composed of three judges pursuant to Section 2284, Title 28 United States Code. Effective 8/19/2020, the Honorable Richard R. Clifton, United States Circuit Judge for the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, and the Honorable Edward M. Chen, United States District Judge for the Northern District of California, to sit with the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. Signed by Chief Judge Sidney R. Thomas, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 8/20/2020 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION Regarding Topics for Early Dispositive Briefings and Responsive Pleading Deadlines filed by Xavier Becerra, State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lucy H. Koh: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/18/2020 from 10:37 AM - 11:37 AM (1 hour). The August 18, 2020 Case Management Order memorializes all relevant information and deadlines from the Conference. Total Time in Court: 1 hour. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. For Plaintiffs: Richard Bress; Sadik Huseny; Steven Bauer; Amit Makker; Shannon D. Lankenau; Ezra Rosenberg; Matthew Wise; Gabrielle Downey Boutin; Maria Bee; and Keith A. Yeomans. For Defendants: Brad Rosenberg and Dan Mauler. For transcript orders, please visit https://cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/18/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 Request to the Chief Judge of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit to Convene a Three-Judge Court Under 28 U.S.C. 2284. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/18/2020. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Case 5:20-cv-05799 NC with 5:20-cv-05167 LHK and 5:20-cv-05169 LHK. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/18/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Xavier Becerra, State of California. (Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Mauler on behalf of Federal Defendants (Mauler, Daniel) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 **CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for August 18, 2020 at 10:30 AM via Zoom Webinar. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to LHKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than 8/17/2020. (Counsel who have already pre-registered for the Initial Case Management Conference in the related case, 5:20-cv-05167-LHK, need not register a second time.) PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618399532?pwd=aklxUFF6TFFpYm10WHppUnZqUUo1dz09Meeting ID: 161 839 9532Password: 919880Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings re Docket Entry #43 filed in Case 20-5167] Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 8/14/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Xavier Becerra, State of California (Wise, R.) (Filed on 8/6/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/29/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Xavier Becerra, State of California.. (Wise, R.) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Downey Boutin (Boutin, Gabrielle) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wise, R.) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Steven Dillingham, Wilbur L. Ross, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Census Bureau, U.S. Department of Commerce ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14742550.). Filed byXavier Becerra, State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wise, R.) (Filed on 7/28/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Maria Bee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles Unified School District
Represented By: Keith Alexander Yeomans
Represented By: Sue Ann Salmon Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Long Beach
Represented By: Monica J. Kilaita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Gabrielle Downey Boutin
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Michael Joseph Dundas
Represented By: Valerie Louise Flores
Represented By: Kathleen Alice Kenealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Gabrielle Downey Boutin
Represented By: R. Matthew Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Census Bureau
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: John V Coghlan,
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur L. Ross
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: John V Coghlan,
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: John V Coghlan,
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Dillingham
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: John Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Commerce
Represented By: Brad Prescott Rosenberg
Represented By: Daniel D. Mauler
Represented By: Jeffrey Bossert Clark
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Represented By: Sopan Joshi
Represented By: John V Coghlan,
Represented By: John Robinson
Represented By: Diane Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Libby Garland
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ron Wyden
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Steven Ruggles
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: U.S. House of Representatives
Represented By: Douglas N. Letter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rachel Buff
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mazie K. Hirono
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Natalia Molina
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Richard Blumenthal
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sherrod Brown
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Elizabeth Warren
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Dianne Feinstein
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Cory A. Booker
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The League of Women Voters
Represented By: Blaine I. Green
Represented By: Dustin James Chase-Woods
Represented By: Michael John Pisko
Represented By: Shani Rivaux
Represented By: Jennifer G Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jeffrey A. Merkley
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Margo Anderson
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Erika Lee
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brian Schatz
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Wydra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: J. Morgan Kousser
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Andrew Beveridge
Represented By: Mark R Trachtenberg
Represented By: Tamara Irene Devitt
Represented By: Richard W. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?