(PC) Lamon v. Foss et al
Plaintiff: Barry Louis Lamon
Defendant: Correctional Guard J. Lopez, Dr. Kelley, J. Ramos, Covarrubius, T. Foss and Correctional Officer R. Diaz
Case Number: 5:2020cv05450
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
2 Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SUA SPONTE GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A SIGNED COMPLAINTORDER. Signed Complaint due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/14/2020. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Barry Louis Lamon. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Signed Complaint due by 9/10/2020. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01517. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/2/2020 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (Henshaw, R)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Barry Louis Lamon. (Henshaw, R)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Barry Louis Lamon. (Coll, A)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Barry Louis Lamon, CDC E-08345 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/29/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Coll, A)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Barry Louis Lamon. (Coll, A) Modified on 7/30/2020 (Plummer, M).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Barry Louis Lamon. (Coll, A)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Barry Louis Lamon. (Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lamon v. Foss et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Guard J. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covarrubius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer R. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Louis Lamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?