Smith v. Saul, Commissioner of SSA
Plaintiff: Gentry Lee Smith
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv05814
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gentry Lee Smith.. (Laffan, Margaret) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA.. (Wiesbrock, Stacy) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Remark - Waiver of Service copy of complaint emailed toJill.Brinton@ssa.gov and SF.OGC.SC@ssa.gov (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on (cv,COURT STAFF) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/19/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gentry Lee Smith. (Laffan, Margaret) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gentry Lee Smith. Filed byGentry Lee Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Laffan, Margaret) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Saul, Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gentry Lee Smith
Represented By: Margaret B Laffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Stacy Elisabeth Wiesbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?