County of Santa Clara et al v. Wang et al
Plaintiff: People of the State of California and County of Santa Clara
Defendant: Walnut Venture LLC, Morgan Venture LLC, Woodside Capital LLC, Ke "Jason" Wang and Chunyan "Cathy" Ge
Case Number: 5:2020cv05823
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING #33 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/8/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 4, 2020 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CORRECT MOTION HEARING DATE. Motion for Reconsideration #33 Hearing is set for 11/12/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/17/2020. Replies due by 9/24/2020. Pursuant to Judge Davila's standing order a party shall obtain a reservation for a motion hearing date PRIOR to the filing of the motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 3, 2020 Filing 33 First MOTION for reconsideration Pursuant to Rule 59(e) filed by Walnut Venture LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2020 08:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/17/2020. Replies due by 9/24/2020. (Wang, Ke) (Filed on 9/3/2020) Modified on 9/3/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #33 First MOTION to Alter Judgment Pursuant to Ru le 59(e) filed by Walnut Venture LLC (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 32 Remark - Pursuant to an order remanding case, transmitted are: Certified original and one copy of this letter, Certified copy of docket entries, Certified copy of remand order. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REMANDING CASE. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #29 and Administrative Motion #30 are TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/1/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 31, 2020 Filing 30 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Pending This Courts Decision on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand filed by County of Santa Clara, People of the State of California. Responses due by 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ward A. Penfold in Support of Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order Pending This Courts Decision on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Restraining Order, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order to Modify Temporary Restraining Order Pending This Courts Decision on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Penfold, Ward) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Remand Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Case to Santa Clara County Superior Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by County of Santa Clara, People of the State of California. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/8/2020. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ward A. Penfold in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Case to Santa Clara County Superior Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-T, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Penfold, Ward) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 28 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davia. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case, except for Discovery matters. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 26 First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Filed byWalnut Venture LLC, Chunyan Ge, Ke Wang, Morgan Venture LLC, Woodside Capital LLC. (Wang, Ke) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (Wang, Ke) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 21, 2020 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Santa Clara, People of the State of California.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service by Mail)(Penfold, Ward) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Lin (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service by Mail)(Lin, Tiffany) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ward Alexander Penfold (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service by Mail)(Penfold, Ward) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by County of Santa Clara re #19 Notice of Appearance (Markoff, Gabriel) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel H Markoff (Markoff, Gabriel) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2020. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/19/20. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC re #13 Exhibits,, #3 Exhibit, #10 Exhibits, #15 Exhibits,, #11 Exhibits, #5 Exhibits, #12 Exhibits, #9 Exhibits, #1 Notice of Removal,, #4 Exhibits, #8 Exhibits, #2 Exhibit, (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified text on 8/19/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 Exhibits of documents filed in Santa Clara County Superior Count. Declaration of James Stephens in Support of Ex Parte Application filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exjibits 11-14 to Declaratiobn, #2 Exhibits 15-20 to Declaration, #3 Exhibits 21-26 to Declaration, #4 Exhibits 27-30 to Declaration, #5 Exhibits 31-36 to Declaration, #6 Exhibits 37-40 to Declaration)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 EXHIBITS Part 2 of Documents filed in Santa Clara Superior Court re Rick Gomes Declaration in Support of Ex-Parte re #13 Exhibits,, filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 32-35 to Declaration, #2 Exhibits 3.6-40 to Declaration, #3 Exhibits 41-45 to Declaration, #4 EXhibit 46 to Declaration, #5 Exhibits 47-50 to Declataion, #6 Exhibit 51 to Declataion, #7 Exhibits 52-53 to Declaration)(Related document(s) #13 ) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBITS to Documents filed in Santa Clara Superior Court re Rick Gomes Declaration in Support of Ex-Parte Application filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #2 Exhibits 4-5 to Declaration, #3 xhibits 6-8 to Declaration, #4 xhibits 9-15 to Declaration, #5 Exhibits 16-19 to Declaration, #6 Exhibitrs 20-25 to Declaration, #7 Exhibits 26-27 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 28 to Declaration)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 EXHIBIT - Document filed in Santa Clara Superior Court - Declaration of Maryellen Luna in Support of Ex-Parte Application filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 EXHIBIT- Document filed in Santa Clara Superior court - Declaration of Roel Meregillano in Support of Ex-Parte Application S filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 EXHIBITS of Documents filed in Santa Clara County Superior Court: Declaration of Jeff in Support of Ex-Parte Application and Exhibits filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 4-6, #2 Exhibits 7-10, #3 Exhibits 11-12) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 EXHIBIT - Documents filed in Santa Clara County Superior Court - Declaration of Matthew Burge re Ex-Parte Application filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBITS - Documents filed in Santa Clara County Superior Count filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (Attachments: #1 Response (Parts 1-2), #2 Oppoosition, #3 Order)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 8/19/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBITS 1 - 14 filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: # *** Docketed in Error Please Disregard.*** (1) Declarationof James Stephens in Support of Ex-Parte Application) (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/19/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #2 Exhibit 14.) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBITS 3-5 filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBITS 1-2 filed byChunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT-B (Continued) by Chunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT-A by Chunyan Ge, Morgan Venture LLC, Walnut Venture LLC, Ke Wang, Woodside Capital LLC.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Exhibit-B) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV368215. ( Filing fee paid of $400, Receipt $ 54611018494 ). Filed by Walnut Venture LLC, Chunyan Ge, Ke Wang, Morgan Venture LLC, Woodside Capital LLC. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt for Payment of Filing Fee) (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/18/2020 (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Santa Clara et al v. Wang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walnut Venture LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Venture LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodside Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ke "Jason" Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunyan "Cathy" Ge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Represented By: Gabriel H Markoff
Represented By: Tiffany Lin
Represented By: Michael L. Rossi
Represented By: Ward Alexander Penfold
Represented By: James Robyzad Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Gabriel H Markoff
Represented By: Tiffany Lin
Represented By: Michael L. Rossi
Represented By: Ward Alexander Penfold
Represented By: James Robyzad Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?