OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC v. Lochhead et al
Plaintiff: OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC
Defendant: gil spencer, Christopher W. Lochhead, ben rewis, Monterey Storage Systems, LLC and Monterey Storage Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv05835
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Christopher W. Lochhead, Ben Rewis, Gil Spencer. Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/29/2020. Replies due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 RJN iso of Motion)(Ciochon, Carl) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 31 Monterey Storage Solutions LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC byMonterey Storage Solutions, LLC. (Ciochon, Carl) (Filed on 10/15/2020)
October 1, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher W. Lochhead, Ben Rewis, Gil Spencer, Monterey Storage Solutions, LLC. Filed byOWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 10/1/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 29 Refund Status re #27 Application for Refund, #26 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to File Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15 (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 27 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14832224 by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Attachments: #1 credit card statement)(Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 22, 2020 Filing 26 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14832128 by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Attachments: #1 credit card statement)(Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Christopher W. Lochhead, Monterey Storage Systems, LLC, Ben Rewis, Gil Spencer (Ciochon, Carl) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl David Ciochon , Thiele R. Dunaway and Anna Nagornaia (Ciochon, Carl) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 10, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Christopher W. Lochhead, Monterey Storage Systems, LLC, Ben Rewis, Gil Spencer. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 9/24/2020. Replies due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gil Spencer in Support)(Ciochon, Carl) (Filed on 9/10/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC as to Christopher Lochhead (Lipanovich, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC as to Monterey Storage Solutions (Lipanovich, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC as to Ben Rewis (Lipanovich, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC as to Gil Spencer (Lipanovich, Nathaniel) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 18 Refund Status re #17 Application for Refund, #16 Application for Refund Declined. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14832224 by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14832128 by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order denying #4 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on August 20, 2020.(ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case except for Discovery Purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUESTING REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Declination Form)(lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC.. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Christopher W. Lochhead, Monterey Storage Systems, LLC, Ben Rewis, Gil Spencer. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint, #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 Declaration in Support, #5 Declaration in Support, (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 Declaration of Jack Heekin in Support of #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Issuance of an Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed byOWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of Anthony J. Hornbach in Support of #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Issuance of an Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed byOWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC identifying Corporate Parent OpenRoads Wealth Capital, LLC for OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Specific Performance of Contract; Other Injunctive Relief, Declaratory Relief; Compensatory Damages; Tortious Interference with Contract; Civil Conspiracy against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14832262.). Filed byOWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC v. Lochhead et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gil spencer
Represented By: Carl David Ciochon
Represented By: Thiele Robin Dunaway
Represented By: Anna Nagornaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher W. Lochhead
Represented By: Carl David Ciochon
Represented By: Thiele Robin Dunaway
Represented By: Anna Nagornaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ben rewis
Represented By: Carl David Ciochon
Represented By: Thiele Robin Dunaway
Represented By: Anna Nagornaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Storage Systems, LLC
Represented By: Carl David Ciochon
Represented By: Thiele Robin Dunaway
Represented By: Anna Nagornaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Storage Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Carl David Ciochon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWC Santa Cruz Mfg LLC
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Holland
Represented By: Nathaniel H. Lipanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?