Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 73.202.36.45
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 73.202.36.45
Case Number: 5:2020cv05836
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL #10 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/22/2020. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 9/21/2020)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #6 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unredacted Complaint and Proposed Summons by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING EX-PARTE APPLICATION #5 FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, PROPOSED SUMMONS, AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/20/2020. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Ex Parte Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Unredacted Complaint, Proposed Summons, and Return of Service filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lincoln Bandlow, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Complaint, #4 Exhibit A to Redacted Complaint, #5 Redacted Proposed Summons, #6 Unredacted Complaint, #7 Unredacted Proposed Summons)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 12/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/24/2020 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement [REDACTED VERSION] against John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 73.202.36.45 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14832770.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to [REDACTED COMPLAINT], #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 73.202.36.45
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 73.202.36.45
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?