Ocampo v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Justin Ocampo
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05857
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Apple Inc. and Local Rule 3-15 Notice of Interested Entities or Persons (Singh, David) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference is advanced and set for 11/12/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ***CORRECTED*** ORDER RELATING CASE; granting (35) Administrative Motion to Relate Case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/22/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 *** POSTED IN ERROR ***ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/21/2020. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) Modified on 9/21/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Singh, David) (Filed on 9/18/2020)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Justin Ocampo (Avakian, Tatiana) (Filed on 9/4/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/25/82020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Justin Ocampo.. (Avakian, Tatiana) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/21/20. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/3/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Avakian, Tatiana) (Filed on 8/19/2020)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14837823.). Filed byJustin Ocampo. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff Justin Ocampo re Proper Venue Under CLRA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avakian, Tatiana) (Filed on 8/19/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocampo v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Ocampo
Represented By: Tatiana G. Avakian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David Ramraj Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?