Kelsey v. Saul
Plaintiff: Brian Kelsey
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 5:2020cv05902
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR STIPULATED STATEMENT OF FACTS. Re: Dkt. No. #5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/22/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Wiesbrock, Stacy) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 Acknowledgment of receipt of Waiver of Service and Complaint from U.S. Attorney's Office. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Complaint and Waiver of Service sent to Jill.Brinton@ssa.gov, SF.OGC.SC@ssa.gov of Social Security and Carminati, Orisme (USACAN) <, Kathy.Terry@usdoj.gov of the U.S. Attorney's Office. Per order of service. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; SCREENING COMPLAINT AND ORDERING SERVICE. Re: Dkt. No #3 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brian Kelsey.. (Kahn, Geri) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 ERRONEOUS ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Brian Kelsey (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020) Modified on 8/21/2020 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brian Kelsey. (Kahn, Geri) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kahn, Geri) (Filed on 8/21/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Andrew Saul. Filed byBrian Kelsey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kahn, Geri) (Filed on 8/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelsey v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Stacy Elisabeth Wiesbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kelsey
Represented By: Geri Nadine Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?