Connolly v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Chansonette Connolly
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv05966
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for December 9, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Chansonette Connolly. Service waived by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Cowell, Jesse) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chansonette Connolly.. (Cowell, Jesse) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jesse Cowell. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/26/2020. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/24/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14858659.) filed by Chansonette Connolly. (Cowell, Jesse) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/8/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Additional Parties: the following parties are listed on #1 Complaint and have been added to this case: Chansonette Connolly and Chansonette Connolly. (This is a text-only entry.) (Roy, Christopher) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14857706.). Filed byUNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roy, Christopher) (Filed on 8/25/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connolly v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Christopher Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chansonette Connolly
Represented By: Christopher Roy
Represented By: Jesse E Cowell
Represented By: William B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?