Xianhua v. Oath Holdings, Inc. f/k/a/Yahoo! Inc., et al
Plaintiff: NING XIANHUA
Defendant: JERRY YANG, TERRY SEMEL, OATH HOLDINGS, INC., f/k/a YAHOO! INC., ALTABA INC., f/k/a YAHOO! INC., Oath Holdings, Inc., Altaba Inc. and Yahoo
Case Number: 5:2020cv06185
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15114366.) filed by Ning Xianhua. (Attachments: #1 Errata Certificate of Good Standing)(Parker, Kevin) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15111984.) filed by Ning Xianhua. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Phillips, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 5, 2020 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per #18 Order: Initial Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 4/7/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2020)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part #13 #14 #15 Briefing Stipulations. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altaba Inc., Oath Holdings, Inc., Terry Semel, Jerry Yang re #15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages //Motion and Joint Stipulation for Additional Pages for the Parties Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Briefs , #13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint , #12 Notice of Appearance, #11 Notice of Appearance, #14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages //Motion and Joint Stipulation for Additional Pages for the Parties Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Briefs, #16 Certificate of Interested Entities (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 28, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Docket Text Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #11 Notice of Appearance for Scott A. Edelman filed by Altaba Inc., J erry Yang, Oath Holdings, Inc., Terry Semel (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Altaba Inc., Oath Holdings, Inc., Terry Semel, Jerry Yang (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages //Motion and Joint Stipulation for Additional Pages for the Parties Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Briefs filed by Altaba Inc., Oath Holdings, Inc., Terry Semel, Jerry Yang. (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages //Motion and Joint Stipulation for Additional Pages for the Parties Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Briefs filed by Altaba Inc., Oath Holdings, Inc., Terry Semel, Jerry Yang. (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Altaba Inc., Oath Holdings, Inc., Terry Semel, Jerry Yang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Perlette Michele Jura (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Edelman (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 9/25/2020) Modified docket text on 9/28/2020 to show the correct name of attorney filing the notice of appearance. (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for Monday, November 23, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due seven days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ning Xianhua.. (Hoffman, Paul) (Filed on 9/16/2020)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ALTABA INC., f/k/a YAHOO! INC., OATH HOLDINGS, INC., f/k/a YAHOO! INC., TERRY SEMEL, JERRY YANG. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/16/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Hoffman, Paul) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by NING XIANHUA . (Hoffman, Paul) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14890657.). Filed byNING XIANHUA. (Hoffman, Paul) (Filed on 9/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xianhua v. Oath Holdings, Inc. f/k/a/Yahoo! Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERRY YANG
Represented By: Scott Alan Edelman
Represented By: Avery Elizabeth Masters
Represented By: Perlette Michele Jura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY SEMEL
Represented By: Scott Alan Edelman
Represented By: Avery Elizabeth Masters
Represented By: Perlette Michele Jura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OATH HOLDINGS, INC., f/k/a YAHOO! INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTABA INC., f/k/a YAHOO! INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oath Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan Edelman
Represented By: Avery Elizabeth Masters
Represented By: Perlette Michele Jura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altaba Inc.
Represented By: Scott Alan Edelman
Represented By: Avery Elizabeth Masters
Represented By: Perlette Michele Jura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo
Represented By: Scott Alan Edelman
Represented By: Avery Elizabeth Masters
Represented By: Perlette Michele Jura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NING XIANHUA
Represented By: Paul Lindsey Hoffman
Represented By: Helen I. Zeldes
Represented By: Kevin P Parker
Represented By: John H. Washington
Represented By: Rebecca L Phillips
Represented By: Ben Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?