Sturm et al v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erick Sturm and Deborah Sturm
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv06965
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC) by Deborah Sturm, Erick Sturm (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 12/1/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #27 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Michael E. Pastore, Counsel for Citizens Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/18/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #26 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Pete S. Michaels, Counsel for Citizens Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/18/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Michael E. Pastore ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15208585.) filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Pastore, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Pete S. Michaels ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15208039.) filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Michaels, Pete) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint - Defendant Citizens Bank, N.A.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint byCitizens Bank, N.A.. (Roy, Alyssa) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 13, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citizens Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Citizens Financial Group, Inc. for Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Roy, Alyssa) (Filed on 11/13/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 23 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Micon, Samuel) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citizens Bank, N.A. Citizens Bank, N.A.'s Certificate of Interested Entities (Roy, Alyssa) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Citizens Bank, N.A.. (Roy, Alyssa) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa B. Roy Notice of Appearance of Alyssa B. Roy as Counsel of Record for Citizens Bank, N.A. (Roy, Alyssa) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Quinn, Jr for Equifax Information Services LLC (Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION to Extend time to respond to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deborah Sturm, Erick Sturm.. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/10/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Deborah Sturm, Erick Sturm (of settlement with Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC) (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Micon, Samuel) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Micon, Samuel) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erick Sturm, Deborah Sturm. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erick Sturm, Deborah Sturm. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erick Sturm, Deborah Sturm. Citizens Bank, N.A. served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erick Sturm, Deborah Sturm. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/12/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Citizens Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/6/2020)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citizens Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15030313.). Filed byErick Sturm, Deborah Sturm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Angelo, Joseph) (Filed on 10/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturm et al v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Sturm
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Sturm
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Pete S. Michaels
Represented By: Michael E. Pastore
Represented By: Alyssa B. Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Aaron Micon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?