Soto v. Future Motion, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elijah Soto
Defendant: Future Motion, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv06982
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICEThe Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. #16 ] is TERMINATED in light of the Request to Withdraw [Dkt. #17 ].The schedule for Defendant to brief all issues arising out of the First Amended Complaint is as follows:Motion: 12/15/20 Opposition: 1/12/21 Reply: 1/26/21The Court will inform the parties if a hearing is necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 24, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and Joint Request for a New Briefing Schedule (Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 11/24/2020)
November 19, 2020 ZOOM APPEARANCE INSTRUCTIONS FOR 12/15/20 MOTION HEARING BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SUSAN VAN KEULEN. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded th at photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Future Motion, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 11/24/2020. Replies due by 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF 1/5/21 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 1/12/21.Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/21 09:30 AM before Magistrate Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Case Management Statement due by 1/5/21. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Order terminating #8 MOTION to Strike and #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Motions terminated in light of Plaintiff's filing of #14 First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/9/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Future Motion, Inc.. Filed byElijah Soto. (Olson, Connor) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elijah Soto.. (Olson, Connor) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/6/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of Pablo Orozco in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed byFuture Motion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Related document(s) #9 ) (Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice filed byFuture Motion, Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Future Motion, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 11/6/2020. Replies due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike filed by Future Motion, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 11/6/2020. Replies due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Future Motion, Inc... (Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 9, 2020 Motions terminated: #6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a), court order on this stipulation is not required. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Future Motion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Future Motion, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Future Motion, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing (Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 10/7/2020)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Cruz. Their case number is 20CV01867. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15035743). Filed byFuture Motion, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pablo Orozco, #2 Declaration of Julian De La Rue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Orozco, Pablo) (Filed on 10/7/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Future Motion, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Motion, Inc.
Represented By: Pablo Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Soto
Represented By: Connor Woolsey Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?