Rosen v. Movie Times, Inc.
Plaintiff: Barry Rosen
Defendant: Movie Times, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv07043
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Movie Times, Inc. (Related documents(s) #14 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Barry Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonah A. Grossbardt, #2 Exhibit A of Jonah A. Grossbardt's Declaration)(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barry Rosen (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.Signed by the Clerk on 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Barry Rosen.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/6/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Movie Times, Inc.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 9, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please complete and file the REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION ON APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT, AO 121 (Rev. 06/16) (CAND version 8/18)fo rm. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Barry Rosen (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Barry Rosen . (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/22/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barry Rosen (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 10/8/2020)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Movie Times, Inc. with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15041727.). Filed by Barry Rosen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 10/8/2020) Modified on 10/9/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20) Re: #1 . #1 Complaint filed by Barry Rosen (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosen v. Movie Times, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Movie Times, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Rosen
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?