Mauldin et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Dan Stapp, Bob Bacon, Todd Spellman, Larry Noon, Kevin Bebee, Bridget Tapia, Frank Diaz, Mike Tallerico, Eunico Trinidad, William Staples, Mike Tapia, Victoria Bebee, Moses Salas, Luis Chacon, John Laurent, Steve Pizzo, Mike Sanchez, Rob Piper, Teresa Mauldin, Felix Diaz, John Castro, George Vega, Gary Weekley, Marc Stelling, Kathy Piper, Paul Eden and Ed Solano
Defendant: Archroma U.S. Inc., Dynax Corporation, MSA Safety, Inc., Royal Ten Cate US, Inc., The Chemours Company L.L.C., Tyco Fire Products, LP, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Fire Service Plus, Inc., 3M Company, Daikin America, Inc., Kidde Firefighting Inc., W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc., E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., Arkema, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., L.N. Curtis & Sons, Perimeter Solutions, LP, Lion Group, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., PBI Performance Products, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Carrier Global Corporation, Does 1 through 25, Buckeye Fire Equipment, Allstar Fire Equipment, National Foam, Inc., Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, L.L.C. and Amerex Corporation
Case Number: 5:2020cv07212
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Case transferred from the Northern District of California has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:21-cv-00366, filed 02/05/2021. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of South Carolina to become part of MDL No. 2873. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Mark Ledger for L.N. Curtis & Son's and Buckeye Fire Equpment Company (Ledger, Brian) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 21, 2021 Filing 118 **CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the Initial Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from January 27, 2021 to April 14, 2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California before Judge Lucy H. Koh. A Joint Case Management Statement is due April 7, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 117 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Initial Case Management Statement filed by Bob Bacon, Kevin Bebee, Victoria Bebee, John Castro, Luis Chacon, Felix Diaz, Frank Diaz, Paul Eden, John Laurent, Teresa Mauldin, Larry Noon, Kathy Piper, Rob Piper, Steve Pizzo, Moses Salas, Mike Sanchez, Ed Solano, Todd Spellman, William Staples, Dan Stapp, Marc Stelling, Mike Tallerico, Bridget Tapia, Mike Tapia, Eunico Trinidad, George Vega, Gary Weekley. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 14, 2021 Filing 116 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** The January 27, 2021 Initial Case Management Conference was mistakenly removed from the public calendar. For clarity, the Initial Case Management Conference remains as set on January 27, 2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh, and a Joint Case Management Statement is due by January 20, 2021, per the Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 43. Please see this Court's scheduling notes and COVID-19 special procedures in place through January 31, 2021 at https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/CEO/cfd.aspx?7142#Notes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2021) Modified on 1/14/2021 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2021 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Bart L. Kessel for Defendants Carrier Global Corporation, Kidde Firefighting Inc. and Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. (Kessel, Bart) (Filed on 1/11/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 114 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bob Bacon, Kevin Bebee, Victoria Bebee, John Castro, Luis Chacon, Felix Diaz, Frank Diaz, Paul Eden, John Laurent, Teresa Mauldin, Larry Noon, Kathy Piper, Rob Piper, Steve Pizzo, Moses Salas, Mike Sanchez, Ed Solano, Todd Spellman, William Staples, Dan Stapp, Marc Stelling, Mike Tallerico, Bridget Tapia, Mike Tapia, Eunico Trinidad, George Vega, Gary Weekley (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
December 29, 2020 Filing 113 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 29, 2020 Filing 112 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Simon, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #109 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 24, 2020 Filing 110 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Madigan, Kristin) (Filed on 12/24/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 109 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15361038.) filed by Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, L.L.C.. (Rothschild, Alexander) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 108 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Yandell, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 107 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 106 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Clark, Roger) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 105 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wagner, Willis) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 104 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Carpenter, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 103 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Esterkin, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 102 Certificate of Interested Entities by E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., The Chemours Company L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Corteva, Inc. for E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co.. (Davis, Jad) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 101 Certificate of Interested Entities by E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., The Chemours Company L.L.C. (Davis, Jad) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 100 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Jad) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 99 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Davis, Jad) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 98 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Geise, Steven) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 97 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options re Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, erroneously sued as MSA Safety, Inc. (Rainey, Brandon) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 96 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options re Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, erroneously sued as MSA Safety, Inc. (Rainey, Brandon) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 95 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Moreno, Paula) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 94 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gilford, Lisa) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 93 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lapidus, Daniel) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 92 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 91 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Van Zandt, Peter) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 21, 2020 Filing 90 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Desrochers, Paul) (Filed on 12/21/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 89 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (by all Plaintiffs) (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 87 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15339391.) filed by Amerex Corporation. (Simon, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order Granting Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/25/2020. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order Granting Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/25/2020. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order Granting Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 11/25/2020. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re David Brent Dwerlkotte ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15210607.) filed by E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., The Chemours Company L.L.C.. (Davis, Jad) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 80 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re David R. Erickson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15210540.) filed by E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co., The Chemours Company L.L.C.. (Davis, Jad) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J Carpenter (Carpenter, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perimeter Solutions, LP identifying Corporate Parent Perimeter Solutions North America, Inc. for Perimeter Solutions, LP. (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 77 Certificate of Interested Entities by Perimeter Solutions, LP identifying Corporate Parent Perimeter Solutions North America, Inc. for Perimeter Solutions, LP. (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 17, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Thurlow for Perimeter Solutions, LP (Thurlow, Matthew) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 73 **FILED IN ERROR -- SEE ECF NO. #74 ** (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020) Modified on 11/16/2020 (kedS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Elizabeth J Carpenter (Carpenter, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Duncan Steven Lemmon and Consent Order Granting Same (Lemmon, Duncan) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jeffrey Scott Wood and Consent Order Granting Same (Wood, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Wood (Wood, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/16/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 68 Certificate of Interested Entities by Daikin America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Daikin Holdings America Inc., Corporate Parent Daikin Industries, Ltd. for Daikin America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Geise, Steven) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Nicholas Geise (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Geise, Steven) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 12, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Duncan Steven Lemmon (Lemmon, Duncan) (Filed on 11/12/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 65 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Foam, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Other Affiliate National Foam, Inc. for National Foam, Inc.. (Wagner, Willis) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
November 11, 2020 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Foam, Inc. (Wagner, Willis) (Filed on 11/11/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 63 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Remand to the Santa Clara County Superior Court Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1447 ) JOINDER to Opposition filed byFire Service Plus, Inc.. (Lapidus, Daniel) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 10, 2020 Filing 62 Certificate of Interested Entities by PBI Performance Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ZB Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate The InterTech Group, LLC, Other Affiliate The Article 6 Marital Trust Under the First Amended and Restated Jerry Zucker Revocable Trust dated April 2, 2007 for PBI Performance Products, Inc.. (Van Zandt, Peter) (Filed on 11/10/2020)
November 9, 2020 Filing 61 REPLY (re #4 MOTION to Remand to the Santa Clara County Superior Court Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1447 ) filed byBob Bacon, Kevin Bebee, Victoria Bebee, John Castro, Luis Chacon, Felix Diaz, Frank Diaz, Paul Eden, John Laurent, Teresa Mauldin, Larry Noon, Kathy Piper, Rob Piper, Steve Pizzo, Moses Salas, Mike Sanchez, Ed Solano, Todd Spellman, William Staples, Dan Stapp, Marc Stelling, Mike Tallerico, Bridget Tapia, Mike Tapia, Eunico Trinidad, George Vega, Gary Weekley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Bob Bacon, #4 Proposed Order (Amended), #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/9/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Ausimont Industries, Inc. for Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, L.L.C.. (Romey, Michael) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 59 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Ausimont Industries, Inc., Other Affiliate Solvay S.A., Other Affiliate Solvac S.A. for Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, L.L.C.. (Romey, Michael) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Hays Yandell (Yandell, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael George Romey (Romey, Michael) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15162592.) filed by Archroma U.S. Inc.. (Raynal, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 6, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15162531.) filed by Archroma U.S. Inc.. (Dubis, Melanie) (Filed on 11/6/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter James Van Zandt (Van Zandt, Peter) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSA Safety, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety, Inc. for MSA Safety, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement for Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC (Rainey, Brandon) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSA Safety, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety, Inc. for MSA Safety, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure for Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC (Rainey, Brandon) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Patrick Rainey as counsel for Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC and Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, erroneously sued as MSA Safety, Inc. (Rainey, Brandon) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Clement L. Glynn as counsel for Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC and Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, erroneously sued as MSA Safety, Inc. (Glynn, Clement) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
November 4, 2020 Filing 49 Joinder re #45 Opposition/Response to Motion, by National Foam, Inc.. (Wagner, Willis) (Filed on 11/4/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allstar Fire Equipment identifying Other Affiliate Joseph Sposato, Other Affiliate Gabe Sayegh, Other Affiliate Jill Hopper for Allstar Fire Equipment. (Hussain, Muhammed) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 3, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy B Esterkin (Esterkin, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/3/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Stephen D. Raber in Opposition to #45 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 6, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 7 - 11, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 13 - 17)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2020) *Unable to create combined PDF file* Modified text on 11/3/2020 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2020 Filing 45 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION to Remand to the Santa Clara County Superior Court Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1447 ) filed byChemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by Archroma U.S. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Archroma Operations S.a.r.1 for Archroma U.S. Inc.. (Clark, Roger) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 43 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for January 27, 2021 at 2:00 PM. The Joint Case Management Statement is due January 20, 2021. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. A hearing on #4 MOTION to Remand to the Santa Clara County Superior Court Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1447 is set for Thursday, March 4, 2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jim Davis Bauch (Bauch, Jim) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
November 2, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan David Lapidus (Lapidus, Ryan) (Filed on 11/2/2020)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #10 Motion to Stay; Denying #11 Motion to Stay; Denying #15 Motion to Shorten Time; Denying #30 Motion for Joinder; Denying #32 Motion for Joinder. (lhklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 30, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Willis M Wagner (Wagner, Willis) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION with Certain Defendants filed by Bob Bacon, Kevin Bebee, Victoria Bebee, John Castro, Luis Chacon, Felix Diaz, Frank Diaz, Paul Eden, John Laurent, Teresa Mauldin, Larry Noon, Kathy Piper, Rob Piper, Steve Pizzo, Moses Salas, Mike Sanchez, Ed Solano, Todd Spellman, William Staples, Dan Stapp, Marc Stelling, Mike Tallerico, Bridget Tapia, Mike Tapia, Eunico Trinidad, George Vega, Gary Weekley. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 37 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Amerex Corporation identifying Corporate Parent McWane, Inc. for Amerex Corporation. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 36 Joinder in Motion to Stay Action or Extend Time to Respond by Amerex Corporation. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by Arkema, Inc. (Gilford, Lisa) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arkema, Inc. (Gilford, Lisa) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fire Service Plus, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Ron Thames for Fire Service Plus, Inc.. (Lapidus, Daniel) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Joinder to MOTION TO STAY THIS ACTION PENDING TRANSFER DECISION BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Fire Service Plus, Inc.. (Lapidus, Daniel) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Muhammed Talal Hussain (Hussain, Muhammed) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 29, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #30 MOTION for Joinder re: Motion to Sta y/Motion to Shorten Time (Doc 10/11) filed by Archroma U.S. Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Joinder re #10 , #11 Motion to Stay/Motion to Shorten Time filed by Archroma U.S. Inc.. (Clark, Roger) (Filed on 10/28/2020) Modified on 10/29/2020 linking entry to document #10 and #11 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lion Group, Inc. (Friedman, Glenn) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lion Group, Inc. (Friedman, Glenn) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger W. Clark for Defendant Archroma, U.S., Inc. (Clark, Roger) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020)
October 27, 2020 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Shorten Time ) filed byBob Bacon, Kevin Bebee, Victoria Bebee, John Castro, Luis Chacon, Felix Diaz, Frank Diaz, Paul Eden, John Laurent, Teresa Mauldin, Larry Noon, Kathy Piper, Rob Piper, Steve Pizzo, Moses Salas, Mike Sanchez, Ed Solano, Todd Spellman, William Staples, Dan Stapp, Marc Stelling, Mike Tallerico, Bridget Tapia, Mike Tapia, Eunico Trinidad, George Vega, Gary Weekley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/27/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chemguard, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP.. (Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc, a publicly-traded company listed on the NYSE for Chemguard, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 26, 2020 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chemguard, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 10/26/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Yardena Rachel Zwang-Weissman (Zwang-Weissman, Yardena) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc. PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-15 AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1 (Rothman, R.) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Raymond Rothman (Rothman, R.) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION with Certain Defendants filed by Bob Bacon, Kevin Bebee, Victoria Bebee, John Castro, Luis Chacon, Felix Diaz, Frank Diaz, Paul Eden, John Laurent, Teresa Mauldin, Larry Noon, Kathy Piper, Rob Piper, Steve Pizzo, Moses Salas, Mike Sanchez, Ed Solano, Todd Spellman, William Staples, Dan Stapp, Marc Stelling, Mike Tallerico, Bridget Tapia, Mike Tapia, Eunico Trinidad, George Vega, Gary Weekley. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Order re #15 MOTION to Shorten Time by Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen D. Raber)(Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 10/23/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by 3M Company (Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D Queen (Queen, Daniel) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John Nadolenco (Nadolenco, John) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay filed by Chemguard, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 11/5/2020. Replies due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP. Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 11/5/2020. Replies due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 3, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Dynax Corporation (Moreno, Paula) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Christine Moreno and Paul V. Lankford (Moreno, Paula) (Filed on 10/22/2020)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Michelle Gilford (Gilford, Lisa) (Filed on 10/21/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn A. Friedman (Friedman, Glenn) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2020. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to the Santa Clara County Superior Court Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1447 filed by Bob Bacon, Kevin Bebee, Victoria Bebee, John Castro, Luis Chacon, Felix Diaz, Frank Diaz, Paul Eden, John Laurent, Teresa Mauldin, Larry Noon, Kathy Piper, Rob Piper, Steve Pizzo, Moses Salas, Mike Sanchez, Ed Solano, Todd Spellman, William Staples, Dan Stapp, Marc Stelling, Mike Tallerico, Bridget Tapia, Mike Tapia, Eunico Trinidad, George Vega, Gary Weekley. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 11/2/2020. Replies due by 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/19/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is No. 20CV370176. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-15068456). Filed byChemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 10/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mauldin et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Roger W. Clark
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Represented By: Melanie Dubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Represented By: Paul Vincent Lankford
Represented By: Paula Christine Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSA Safety, Inc.
Represented By: Clement L. Glynn
Represented By: Brandon Patrick Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Ten Cate US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company L.L.C.
Represented By: Jad Terrell Davis
Represented By: David Brenton Dwerlkotte
Represented By: David Robert Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products, LP
Represented By: Stephen David Raber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin J. Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Service Plus, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lapidus
Represented By: Ryan David Lapidus
Represented By: Jim Davis Bauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: Daniel D Queen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daikin America, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Nicholas Geise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Firefighting Inc.
Represented By: Bart L. Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy B Esterkin
Represented By: R. Raymond Rothman
Represented By: Yardena Rachel Zwang-Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co.
Represented By: Jad Terrell Davis
Represented By: David Brenton Dwerlkotte
Represented By: David Robert Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Michelle Gilford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen David Raber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.N. Curtis & Sons
Represented By: Brian Mark Ledger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perimeter Solutions, LP
Represented By: Matthew David Thurlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lion Group, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Andre Desrochers
Represented By: Glenn A. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen David Raber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBI Performance Products, Inc.
Represented By: Peter James Van Zandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Represented By: Bart L. Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Represented By: Bart L. Kessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstar Fire Equipment
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Represented By: Muhammed Talal Hussain
Represented By: Duncan Steven Lemmon
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Represented By: Willis M Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solvay Specialty Polymers, USA, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael George Romey
Represented By: Elizabeth Hays Yandell
Represented By: Alexander Paul Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas Justin Boos
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Stapp
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob Bacon
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Spellman
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Noon
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bebee
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Tapia
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Diaz
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Tallerico
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunico Trinidad
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Staples
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Tapia
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Bebee
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Salas
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Chacon
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Laurent
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Pizzo
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Sanchez
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Piper
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Mauldin
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Diaz
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Castro
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Vega
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Weekley
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Stelling
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Piper
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Eden
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Solano
Represented By: Richard Robert Seal
Represented By: Heather Page Haggarty
Represented By: Bethany Caracuzzo
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Pritzker
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?