Huang v. Sapia Networks Inc.
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Sapia Networks Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv07608
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Xiaohua Huang (Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byXiaohua Huang. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/22/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sapia Networks Inc. (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sapia Networks Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 12/14/2020. Replies due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David E. Enzminger and Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order)(Enzminger, David) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sapia Networks Inc... (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Enzminger as Counsel for Defendant Sapia Networks, Inc. (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 11/30/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/7/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 30, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sapia Networks Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.). Filed byXiaohua Huang. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 reciept)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sapia Networks Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Sapia Networks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapia Networks Inc.
Represented By: David P. Enzminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?