Segal v. United States of America, et al
Plaintiff: Melvyn Segal
Defendant: US Attorney's Office, Commissioner Of Internal Revenue Service, Commissioner of Internal Revenue, United States Attorney General Office and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2020cv08681
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 2/16/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvyn Segal. United States of America served on 12/16/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. Summons served on Commissioner of Internal Revenue; United States of America (Segal, Melvyn) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Melvyn Segal.. (Segal, Melvyn) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue, United States of America, U.S. Attorney (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/10/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Segal, Melvyn) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 *PLEASE DISREAGED POSTED IN ERROR* SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020) Modified on 12/9/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/22/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Violations of 26 U.S.C. 7432, et al Civil Damages against Commissioner Of Internal Revenue Service, Commissioner of Internal Revenue, US Attorney's Office, United States Attorney General Office ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15290211.). Filed byMelvyn Segal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Segal, Melvyn) (Filed on 12/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segal v. United States of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvyn Segal
Represented By: Melvyn Lee Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?