Sweepstakes Today, LLC v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sweepstakes Today, LLC
Defendant: Alphabet Inc., YouTube, LLC and Google LLC
Interested Party: Sterling International Consulting Group, The Progressive, Inc., Genius Media Group, Inc. and The Nation Company, L.P.
Case Number: 5:2020cv08984
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2021)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 42 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/04/2021, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (41 in 5:20-cv-08984-BLF) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2021. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 8, 2021 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/04/2021 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Sweepstakes Today, LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Mitchell, David) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
February 4, 2021 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Case Management Conference held on 2/4/2021.Total Time in Court: 52 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: David W. Mitchell, Steven M. Jodlowski, John Christopher Herman via Zoom Webinar. Defendant Attorney: John Edward Schmidtlein, Sophia Marie Rios via Zoom Webinar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2021)
February 1, 2021 Filing 39 CLERKS NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 3, 2021 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no docu ment associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 38 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Publisher Plaintiffs filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. (Mitchell, David) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 28, 2021 Filing 37 Statement Regarding Consolidation by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/28/2021)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #29 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/26/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021)
January 22, 2021 Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Set Case Management Conference re #34 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, - To be determined. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR FEBRUARY 4, 2021 AT 10AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ON MOTIONS TO RELATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings re Order Relating Cases. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying #30 Administrative Motion For Earlier Hearing Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 30 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Earlier Hearing Date re Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #27 Renotice motion hearing , MOTION for Hearing CORRECTION OF DOCKET #28 filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Responses due by 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Jodlowski in support thereof, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mitchell, David) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Document #28 listed case numbers 5:20-cv-09092-BLF and 3:20-cv-09321-VC. This document is not applicable to those cases. Please re-file document in its entirety with only the case caption 4:20-cv-08984 HSG. [err102] Re: #28 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Earlier Hearing Date re Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #27 Renotice motion hearing MOTION for Hearing filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 15, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for John C. Herman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15452348.) filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. (Herman, John) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2021 Filing 28 ***RE-FILED AT DOC #30 *** ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Earlier Hearing Date re Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #27 Renotice motion hearing , MOTION for Hearing filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Responses due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Jodlowski in support thereof, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mitchell, David) (Filed on 1/15/2021) Modified on 1/19/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/20/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2021 Reset Hearing as to #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, See Docket No. #27 : Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 13, 2021 Filing 27 Renotice motion hearing re #24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed bySweepstakes Today, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #24 ) (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2021)
January 12, 2021 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the #24 motion to consolidate. Hearing date of March 4, 2021, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. March 4th wasnt the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. If counsel would like to request an earlier date, an administrative motion or a stipulation and proposed order should be filed after the motion is re-noticed. And if granted, the Court will advance the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 25 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE STERLING INTERNATIONAL PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES (re #21 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/11/2021) Modified on 1/12/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 1/22/2021. Replies due by 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Jodlowski in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC ; Corporate Parent Google LLC for YouTube, LLC. (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 8, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by John Edward Schmidtlein (Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/8/2021)
January 7, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Sophia M. Rios, #3 Proposed Order)(Rios, Sophia) (Filed on 1/7/2021)
January 5, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sweepstakes Today, LLC regarding service of Civil Standing Orders (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 5, 2021 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Judges name is incorrect on the signature line of the Proposed Order. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should refere nce the Judges name as Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on future filings. Re: #19 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by YouTube, LLC, Google LLC, Alphabet Inc. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 30, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Genius Media Group, Inc., The Nation Company, L.P., The Progressive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 30, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for March 23, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by March 16th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:29-cv-08984-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2020)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/29/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 28, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sweepstakes Today, LLC.. (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Service waived by YouTube, LLC waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Service waived by Google LLC waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sweepstakes Today, LLC. Service waived by Alphabet Inc. waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/22/2021. (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC Notice of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmidtlein, John) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, and YouTube, LLC. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (elyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Jodlowski (Jodlowski, Steven) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Mitchell (Mitchell, David) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 12/16/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/29/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sweepstakes Today, LLC (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2020)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Sherman Antitrust Act and the Clayton Act against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, YouTube, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15321509.). Filed bySweepstakes Today, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pfefferbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 12/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweepstakes Today, LLC v. Google LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweepstakes Today, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jacob Pfefferbaum
Represented By: John Christopher Herman
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Steven M. Jodlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: John Edward Schmidtlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sterling International Consulting Group
Represented By: Sophia Marie Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Progressive, Inc.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Genius Media Group, Inc.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Nation Company, L.P.
Represented By: Hsiao C. Mao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?