Ou-Young v. County of Santa Clara et al
Plaintiff: Kuang-Bao P Ou-Young
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA, County of Santa Clara, Kimberly McCrickard, Kamala D. Harris, John G. Roberts, Jr., Anthony M Kennedy, William P. Barr, Elena Kagan, Barry G. Silverman, Richard Seeborg, Lawrence E Stone, Edward M. Chen, David L. Anderson, Mary M. Schroeder, William H Orrick, Susan Y Soong, Lucy H. Koh, John Chase, Stephen G. Breyer, Sonia Sotomayor, Samuel A Alito, Jr., Jeffrey F. Rosen, Beth Labson Freeman, Clarence Thomas, Phyllis J. Hamilton and Sidney R. Thomas
Case Number: 5:2020cv09097
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 16 Filing fee paid of $ 505.00 re #15 Appeal. Receipt number 54611018578. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021) Modified on 1/21/2021 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of USCA as to #13 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Kuang-Bao P Ou-Young. Order to show cause docket fee due. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2021)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 USCA Scheduling Order as to #13 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Kuang-Bao P Ou-Young. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Kuang-Bao P. Ou-Young opening brief due 02/26/2021. Appellees Xavier Becerra, Kamala D. Harris, Attorney General and Kimberly McCrickard answering brief due 03/29/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. 11950658 (Dela Cruz, Jessica) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021)
December 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kuang-Bao P Ou-Young. Appeal of Order, #9 (APPEAL FEE NOT PAID.) (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: This action has been terminated pursuant to #9 ORDER Re Pre-Filing Review and Dismissing Case. Accordingly, the Court denies as moot #7 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by XAVIER BECERRA, Kamala D. Harris, Kimberly McCrickard and #11 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Kuang-Bao P Ou-Young. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Kuang-Bao P Ou-Young. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by XAVIER BECERRA, Kamala D. Harris, Kimberly McCrickard (Attachments: #1 Supplement Order Re Pre-filing Review and Dismissing Case)(Pasquali, Rolando) (Filed on 12/23/2020)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Re Pre-Filing Review and Dismissing Case. Therefore, in accordance with the Order requiring pre-filing review by Judge Freeman, the Court DISMISSES the claims against federal judges, prosecutors, and court staff. Plaintiffs complaint against the remaining state and county parties is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Plaintiff, if he chooses, to pursue his action against the appropriate non-federal judicial and court parties in the appropriate forum. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed not to accept the complaint for filing. IT IS SO ORDERED Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/22/2020. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 12/22/2020 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by XAVIER BECERRA, Kamala D. Harris, Kimberly McCrickard.. (Pasquali, Rolando) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by XAVIER BECERRA, Kamala D. Harris, Kimberly McCrickard. Responses due by 1/19/2021. Replies due by 2/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Pasquali, Rolando) (Filed on 12/22/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by XAVIER BECERRA, Kamala D. Harris, Kimberly McCrickard (Pasquali, Rolando) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Rolando William Pasquali (Pasquali, Rolando) (Filed on 12/18/2020)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Referring Case to General Duty Judge. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/18/2020. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 20CV372913. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-15330629). Filed byXAVIER BECERRA, Kamala D. Harris, Kimberly McCrickard. (Attachments: #1 CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT, #3 NOTICE OF APPLICABILITY OF PRE-FILING SCREENING ORDER, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Vincent, Jeffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ou-Young v. County of Santa Clara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: Jeffrey Richard Vincent
Represented By: Rolando William Pasquali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly McCrickard
Represented By: Jeffrey Richard Vincent
Represented By: Rolando William Pasquali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: Jeffrey Richard Vincent
Represented By: Rolando William Pasquali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Roberts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony M Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Kagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry G. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Seeborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward M. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary M. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H Orrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Y Soong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy H. Koh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen G. Breyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Sotomayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A Alito, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey F. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Labson Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney R. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kuang-Bao P Ou-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?