A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC et al
Plaintiff: A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan
Defendant: Lupin Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Hikma Labs Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc, PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,, Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc and Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00019
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lucy H Koh
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 51 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:20-cv-06003. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 30, 2020 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - no District of California. (sjo)
December 30, 2020 Filing 50 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/29/2020) (sjo)
December 28, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #46 Motion for Stanley E. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk of Court directed to terminate the motion (doc. 46). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/09/2020) (ama)
October 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/8/2021. Responses due by 1/8/2021. Replies due by 1/8/2021. (yv)
October 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #36 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' pre-motion letter, dated September 8, 2020, seeking leave of the Court to file a motion to transfer venue. (ECF No. 36.) The Court waives the pre-motion conference requirement and grants Defendants leave to file their motion with the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendants' moving papers shall be served, not filed, on November 13, 2020; (2) Plaintiff's opposition papers shall be served, not filed, on December 18, 2020; and (3) Defendants' reply papers shall be served on January 8, 2021. The parties are directed to file all motion documents on the reply date, January 8, 2021. The parties shall provide two (2) copies of their respective motion documents to Chambers on the date the documents are served upon their adversary. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 36. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/3/20) (yv)
October 2, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #46 MOTION for Stanley E. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21957590. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 2, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Stanley E. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21957590. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration for Motion for S. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit to Motion for S. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit to Motion for S. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion for S. Fisher to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Fisher, Stanley)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #41 Motion for Monsura A. Sirajee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 41.. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/24/2020) (ks)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #38 Motion for Heidi K. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Heidi K. Hubbard, for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/24/2020) (va)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #40 Motion for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 40. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/24/2020) (ks)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #39 Motion for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 39. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/24/2020) (ks)
September 23, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #39 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792462. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #40 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #41 MOTION for Monsura A. Sirajee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792925. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 22, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Monsura A. Sirajee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792925. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monsura A. Sirajee, #2 CA - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Sirajee, Monsura)
September 22, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Stephen J. McIntyre to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792918. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre, #2 CA - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(McIntyre, Stephen)
September 22, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Benjamin G. Bradshaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21792462. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Bradshaw, #2 DC - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 CA - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Bradshaw, Benjamin)
September 22, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Heidi K. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21781749. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
September 22, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Heidi K. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21781749. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration for Motion for H. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion for H. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit to Motion for H. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for H. Hubbard to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Hubbard, Heidi)
September 10, 2020 Filing 37 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Kimberly C. Walker dated September 10, 2020 re: #36 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Benjamin M. Greenblum dated September 8, 2020. . Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Walker, Kimberly)
September 8, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Benjamin M. Greenblum dated September 8, 2020. Document filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE terminating #30 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #30 MOTION for Thomas M. Loper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 30. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/8/2020) (jca)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ON ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #33 Motion for Kimberly Calametti Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 33. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 9/8/2020) (rro)
August 31, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Kimberly Calametti Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21388118. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Kimberly Calametti Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21388118. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberly C. Walker in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Alabama, #3 Certificate of Good Standing from the Supreme Court of Mississippi, #4 Proposed Order on Admission, #5 Certificate of Service).(Walker, Kimberly)
August 25, 2020 Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Fosun International Limited, Other Affiliate TPG Global, LLC, Other Affiliate Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. Document filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC..(Allon, Devora)
August 25, 2020 Filing 31 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Lupin Ltd., Other Affiliate Nanomi BV for Lupin Inc.; Other Affiliate Lupin Ltd. for Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Document filed by Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Allon, Devora)
August 25, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION to Amend/Correct . MOTION for Thomas M. Loper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
August 25, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Amend/Correct ., MOTION for Thomas M. Loper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing Supreme Court AL, #2 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing Supreme Court MS, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing DC).(Loper, Thomas)
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals plc for Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. Document filed by Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp...(Pace, Jack)
August 25, 2020 Filing 28 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 27 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin M. Greenblum on behalf of Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC..(Greenblum, Benjamin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathryn Jordan Mims on behalf of Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp...(Mims, Kathryn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jack Pace on behalf of Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Roxane Laboratories Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp...(Pace, Jack)
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gilad Bendheim on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Bendheim, Gilad)
August 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Philip Lefkowitz on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Lefkowitz, Jay)
August 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Devora Whitman Allon on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Lupin Inc., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc...(Allon, Devora)
August 20, 2020 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc. for PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Document filed by PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Williamson, Brett)
August 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Johnston Williamson on behalf of PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc...(Williamson, Brett)
August 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Catherine Clerkin on behalf of A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Clerkin, Michelle)
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hikma Labs Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Hikma Labs Inc. on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Roxane Laboratories Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Roxane Laboratories on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Par Pharmaceutical Inc. on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lupin Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Lupin Inc. on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lupin Ltd. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Lupid Ltd. on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc. on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC served on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC on 8/5/2020. Service was accepted by Gina Martinez. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. Service was accepted by Alexander Privat. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement served on West-Ward Pharmaceuticals on 8/7/2020. Service was accepted by Alexander Privat. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
August 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Thomas Loper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20993378. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court Mississippi and Alabama. We do not accept certificates from stste bar registrations from these two states.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Thomas Loper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20993378. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit letter of Good Standing AL, #3 Exhibit letter of Good Standing DC, #4 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing MS, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Loper, Thomas) Modified on 8/4/2020 (bcu).
August 3, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Morris Buchman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: All parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Roxane Laboratories Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (sj)
August 3, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 3, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
August 3, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Buchman, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals Plc, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Plc, Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc., Lupin Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Roxane Laboratories Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Hikma Labs Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Jazz Pharmaceuticals Public Limited Company, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Roxane Laboratories Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20950709)Document filed by A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan..(Buchman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Inc.
Represented By: Jay Philip Lefkowitz
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Represented By: Devora Whitman Allon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Jack Pace
Represented By: Kathryn Jordan Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxane Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Pace
Represented By: Kathryn Jordan Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Labs Inc.
Represented By: Jack Pace
Represented By: Kathryn Jordan Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Jay Philip Lefkowitz
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Represented By: Devora Whitman Allon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,
Represented By: Stephen McIntyre
Represented By: Brett Johnston Williamson
Represented By: Benjamin Bradshaw
Represented By: Monsura A. Sirajee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Jay Philip Lefkowitz
Represented By: Gilad Bendheim
Represented By: Devora Whitman Allon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Jack Pace
Represented By: Kathryn Jordan Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC
Represented By: Stanley Edward Fisher
Represented By: Benjamin M Greenblum
Represented By: Heidi K Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F. of L. - A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan
Represented By: Kimberly Calametti Walker
Represented By: Michelle Catherine Clerkin
Represented By: Michael Morris Buchman
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?