Ginsberg et al v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ambassador Marc Ginsberg and Coalition for a Safer Web
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00425
Filed: January 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION (Joint) to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple, Inc.. (Singer, David) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Singer, David) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Tainsky Spelman (Spelman, Kate) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Singer (Singer, David) (Filed on 3/3/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Altman, Keith) (Filed on 2/17/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 20, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Coalition for a Safer Web, Marc Ginsberg.. (Altman, Keith) (Filed on 1/20/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/2/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2021)
January 17, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Coalition for a Safer Web, Marc Ginsberg . (Altman, Keith) (Filed on 1/17/2021)
January 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15454846.). Filed byMarc Ginsberg, Coalition for a Safer Web. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Altman, Keith) (Filed on 1/17/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ginsberg et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Singer
Represented By: Kate Tainsky Spelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambassador Marc Ginsberg
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition for a Safer Web
Represented By: Keith L. Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?