County of Santa Clara et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Center for Science in the Public Interest, County of Santa Clara, National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners, Natural Resources Defense Council, American Lung Association and California Tribal Families Coalition
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Norris Cochran
Case Number: 5:2021cv01655
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #32 STIPULATION STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/23/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Case filed by Norris Cochran, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (Myers, Steven) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Andrew Myers (Myers, Steven) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #24 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 29 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Natural Resources Defense Council (Spence, Samara) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 28 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners (Spence, Samara) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 27 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Center for Science in the Public Interest (Spence, Samara) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 26 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by California Tribal Families Coalition (Spence, Samara) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 25 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by American Lung Association (Spence, Samara) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 17, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Lisa S Mankofsky ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15713613.) filed by Center for Science in the Public Interest. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Mankofsky, Lisa) (Filed on 3/17/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #21 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/16/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natural Resources Defense Council, County of Santa Clara, American Lung Association, National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners, California Tribal Families Coalition, Center for Science in the Public Interest. Norris Cochran served on 3/13/2021, answer due 5/12/2021; U.S. Department of Health and Human Services served on 3/13/2021, answer due 5/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Spence, Samara) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 16, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15706349.) filed by Center for Science in the Public Interest. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Simon, Matthew) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/15/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #11 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/15/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/15/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #5 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/15/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/15/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15686929.) filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Colangelo, Aaron) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15681062.) filed by Natural Resources Defense Council. (Rolnick, Adeline) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Santa Clara.. (Van Kirk, Lorraine) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Norris Cochran, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/23/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15676187.) filed by American Lung Association, California Tribal Families Coalition, Center for Science in the Public Interest, County of Santa Clara, National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(Spence, Samara) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15676163.) filed by American Lung Association, California Tribal Families Coalition, Center for Science in the Public Interest, County of Santa Clara, National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(Lev, Sean) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15676090.) filed by American Lung Association, California Tribal Families Coalition, Center for Science in the Public Interest, County of Santa Clara, National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing)(Dubner, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Van Kirk, Lorraine) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Van Kirk, Lorraine) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norris Cochran, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Filed byNatural Resources Defense Council, County of Santa Clara, American Lung Association, National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners, California Tribal Families Coalition, Center for Science in the Public Interest. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Kirk, Lorraine) (Filed on 3/9/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Santa Clara et al v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Steven Andrew Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris Cochran
Represented By: Steven Andrew Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Science in the Public Interest
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Represented By: Samara M. Spence
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin Simon
Represented By: Lisa Sara Mankofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Represented By: Samara M. Spence
Represented By: Lorraine Van Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Represented By: Samara M. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Represented By: Samara M. Spence
Represented By: Adeline S Rolnick
Represented By: Aaron Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Lung Association
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Represented By: Samara M. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Tribal Families Coalition
Represented By: Sean A. Lev
Represented By: Jeffrey Benjamin Dubner
Represented By: Samara M. Spence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?