Hoose et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hoose and Sheera Harris
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv01676
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Filing 26 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 4/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Relating Case #23 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/23/2021. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 21, 2021 Filing 23 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO MDL filed by Sheera Harris, Jennifer Hoose. Responses due by 4/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gold, Andrea) (Filed on 4/21/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 4/14/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 14, 2021. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 20 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Maxine M. Chesney.. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longr assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Filing 19 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/13/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021) Modified on 4/13/2021 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sheera Harris, Jennifer Hoose.. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
March 31, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer filed by Apple Inc.. (Kim, Brooke) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 26, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/9/2021. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 19, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Hoose, Sheera Harris. Apple Inc. served on 3/11/2021, answer due 4/1/2021. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/19/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #9 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Kristen L. Cardoso. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #8 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Andrea R. Gold. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15693405.) filed by Sheera Harris, Jennifer Hoose. (Cardoso, Kristen) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15691883.) filed by Sheera Harris, Jennifer Hoose. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gold, Andrea) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hassan Ali Zavareei (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/23/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sheera Harris, Jennifer Hoose (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15677219.). Filed byJennifer Hoose, Sheera Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 3/9/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoose et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hoose
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Represented By: Kristen Cardoso
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheera Harris
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Represented By: Kristen Cardoso
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Andrea R. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Brooke Killian Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?