Skillz Platform Inc. v. AviaGames Inc.
Plaintiff: Skillz Platform Inc.
Defendant: AviaGames Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv02436
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by AviaGames Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Patent Infringement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by AviaGames Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/11/2021. Replies due by 6/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Sacksteder, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #23 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/23/2021. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by AviaGames Inc.. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lee Benzler on Behalf of Defendant AviaGames Inc. (Benzler, Jessica) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Lithaw Lim on Behalf of Defendant AviaGames Inc. (Lim, Lithaw) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan A. Kohm on Behalf of Defendant AviaGames Inc. (Kohm, Bryan) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Sacksteder on Behalf of Defendant AviaGames Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Skillz Platform Inc.. AviaGames Inc. served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021. (Yang, Lance) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance L Yang (Yang, Lance) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Michael Schwartz (Schwartz, Robert) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Sang-Chul Pak (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #10 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/9/2021.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed. Re: #12 Certificate of Service filed by Skillz Platfo rm Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Skillz Platform Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Yang, Lance) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 4/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15811485.) filed by Skillz Platform Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hagiz, Ron) (Filed on 4/8/2021)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Skillz Platform Inc... (Yang, Lance) (Filed on 4/7/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to AviaGames Inc. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Skillz Platform Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Skillz Inc. for Skillz Platform Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 4/5/2021) Modified on 4/6/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pak, Sean) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AviaGames Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15795647). Filed by Skillz Platform Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Pak, Sean) (Filed on 4/5/2021) Modified on 4/6/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skillz Platform Inc. v. AviaGames Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skillz Platform Inc.
Represented By: Sean Sang-Chul Pak
Represented By: Ron Hagiz
Represented By: Lance L Yang
Represented By: Robert Michael Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AviaGames Inc.
Represented By: Lithaw Lim
Represented By: Michael John Sacksteder
Represented By: Bryan A. Kohm
Represented By: Jessica Lee Benzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?