Elkhorn Road Water System #4 v. Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: Elkhorn Road Water System #4
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company and Dow Chemical Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv02960
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Darius Kayhan as Counsel for Defendant The Dow Chemical Company (Kayhan, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/11/2021)
June 10, 2021 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 10/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 6/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shell Oil Company.. (Smith, Jay) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elkhorn Road Water System #4.. (Mansergh, Seth) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 7, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dow Chemical Company.. (Langner, Bailey) (Filed on 6/7/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 6/8/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc. for Dow Chemical Company. (Langner, Bailey) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 15 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Dow Chemical Company identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc. for Dow Chemical Company. (Langner, Bailey) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byDow Chemical Company. (Langner, Bailey) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell, plc for Shell Oil Company. (Smith, Jay) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byShell Oil Company. (Smith, Jay) (Filed on 5/25/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elkhorn Road Water System #4. Shell Oil Company served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Sansone, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 12, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elkhorn Road Water System #4. Dow Chemical Company served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (Sansone, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 7, 2021 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety as Summons Returned Executed. Re: #8 Certificate of Service, filed by Elkhorn R oad Water System #4, #9 Certificate of Service, filed by Elkhorn Road Water System #4 (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elkhorn Road Water System #4 re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #7 Summons Issued, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #5 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities SHELL OIL COMPANY (Sansone, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elkhorn Road Water System #4 re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #7 Summons Issued, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #5 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY (Sansone, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dow Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Elkhorn Road Water System #4 of Pendency of Other Actions (L.R. 3-13) (Mansergh, Seth) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elkhorn Road Water System #4 (Mansergh, Seth) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment #1 to Summons)(Mansergh, Seth) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/7/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dow Chemical Company, Shell Oil Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15879584.). Filed byElkhorn Road Water System #4. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mansergh, Seth) (Filed on 4/23/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elkhorn Road Water System #4 v. Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Jay Estill Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Nicholas Darius Kayhan
Represented By: Bailey J. Langner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elkhorn Road Water System #4
Represented By: Seth D. Mansergh
Represented By: Kenneth A. Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?