Henry v. Siotos et al
Plaintiff: Chris Henry
Defendant: Corinda Siotos, Old Republic Title Company, McGovern Escrow Services, United States of America and John Siotos
Case Number: 5:2021cv03637
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Siotos.. (Rice, Mark) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant and Cross-Complainant John Siotos shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark John Rice on behalf of Defendant/Cross-Complainant John Siotos (Rice, Mark) (Filed on 6/18/2021)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byUnited States of America. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant United States of America shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/15/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal, (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal, (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Extend Response Deadline filed by United States of America. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV 2003161. (). Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 5/14/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Siotos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinda Siotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGovern Escrow Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Siotos
Represented By: Mark John Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Henry
Represented By: Douglas A. Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?