Nreal Technology Ltd. et al v. Epic Games, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nreal Technology Ltd., Nreal, Inc. and Shenzhen Tairuo Technology Co.. Ltd.
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv05537
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER APPROVING #20 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/19/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Schweitzer, Lauren) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren J. Schweitzer for Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Schweitzer, Lauren) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Marie Torres for Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Torres, Diana) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 17, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Cendali for Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 5, 2021 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2021 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2021)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/4/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nreal Technology Ltd., Nreal, Inc., Shenzhen Tairuo Technology Co.. Ltd... (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/3/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Laurel Beeler upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Laurel Beeler's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/20/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2021 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Epic Games, Inc.. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/20/21. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nreal Technology Ltd., Nreal, Inc., Shenzhen Tairuo Technology Co.. Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate Bing Xiao, Other Affiliate Peng Jin, Other Affiliate Chi Xu, Other Affiliate Shanghai Linnai Enterprise Management Partnership (L.P.), Other Affiliate Shenzhen Hongtai Growth Venture Investment Center (L.P.), Other Affiliate Beijing Hongtai Boost Venture Investment Center (L.P.), Other Affiliate Shanghai Wuxiang Enterprise Development Center (L.P.) for Shenzhen Tairuo Technology Co.. Ltd.; Corporate Parent Nreal Ltd. for Nreal Technology Ltd., Nreal, Inc.. (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Nreal Technology Ltd., Nreal, Inc., Shenzhen Tairuo Technology Co.. Ltd. [Notice of Pendency of Other Action Under L.R. 3-13] (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark. (cc: form mailed to register). (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demandfor Declaratory Judgment against Epic Games, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16194050.). Filed by Nreal Technology Ltd., Shenzhen Tairuo Technology Co.. Ltd., Nreal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rutowski, Diana) (Filed on 7/19/2021) Modified on 7/20/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nreal Technology Ltd. et al v. Epic Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nreal Technology Ltd.
Represented By: Diana Rutowski
Represented By: Maria Nikolaevna Sokova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nreal, Inc.
Represented By: Diana Rutowski
Represented By: Maria Nikolaevna Sokova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenzhen Tairuo Technology Co.. Ltd.
Represented By: Diana Rutowski
Represented By: Maria Nikolaevna Sokova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Dale Cendali
Represented By: Diana Marie Torres
Represented By: Lauren J. Schweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?