Riordan et al v. Western Digital Corporation
Plaintiff: Kevin Riordan, Ashley Laurent, Jeremy Bobo and Nagui Sorial
Defendant: Western Digital Corporation
Case Number: 5:2021cv06074
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #40 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/29/2023. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Laura Grace Van Note (Van Note, Laura) (Filed on 9/11/2023)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by Laura Grace Van Note (Van Note, Laura) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2023 is VACATED - to be reset at a later date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent, Kevin Riordan, Nagui Sorial. (Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 6/22/2023)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Nicholas Reiss Green Notice of Withdrawal of Nicholas R. Green as Counsel for Western Digital Corporation (Green, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/1/2023)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings per #55 Order: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2023 is Continued to 7/6/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2023)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting #52 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/26/2023. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2023)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 5/10/2023)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2023 is Continued to 6/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2023)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kevin Riordan. (Bolce, Cody) (Filed on 4/17/2023)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE. Pursuant to #45 Order, Initial Case Management Conference has been CONTINUED to 4/27/2023. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #40 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 1/26/2023 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 1/26/2023 hearing is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order Granting #45 Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference *As Modified*. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2023. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 1/19/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Granting #43 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/8/2022. (ejdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2022)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2022 Continued to 2/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2022)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin E. Meyer)(Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 9/7/2022)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REPLY (re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) filed byWestern Digital Corporation. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 8/15/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ) filed byJeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent, Kevin Riordan, Nagui Sorial. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Western Digital Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/8/2022. Replies due by 8/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION (Joint) Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Reaghan E. Braun (Braun, Reaghan) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: against Western Digital Corporation. Filed byNagui Sorial, Kevin Riordan, Jeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Granting #35 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Conference continued to 9/29/2022. Statement due 9/19/2022. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on June 21, 2022. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Case Management Conference filed by Western Digital Corporation. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines/Hearings per #36 Order: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2022. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order granting #22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on June 7, 2022. Should Plaintiffs choose to file an amended complaint, they must do so by June 27, 2022. (ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #22 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 6/2/2022 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 6/2/2022 hearing is VACATED NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting ***AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*** #27 Stipulated ESI Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/1/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting ***AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*** #30 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/1/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2022)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMAITON AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Jeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent, Kevin Riordan, Nagui Sorial. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Discovery Order: By February 4, 2022, the Parties are to file either (1) the items requested in 28 1/18/2022 Clerk's Notice or (2) a joint report regarding the status of the ESI Order and Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/31/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE Dkt. 27-1 is described as the proposed order on the Parties Stipulated ESI Order [Dkt. #27 ], but Dkt. 27-1 is a stipulated protective order. Please submit the proposed order on the ESI stipulation.Also if intention was to submit a proposed Stipulated Protective Order, please file that separately, along with a redline as required under Judge van Keulens standing order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2022)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION filed by Jeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent, Kevin Riordan, Nagui Sorial. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Scott) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARINGS. Please take NOTICE that the Motion #22 to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/24/2022 is CONTINUED to 6/2/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2022 is CONTINUED to 7/14/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byWestern Digital Corporation. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byJeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent, Kevin Riordan, Nagui Sorial. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 10/21/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING DEADLINE AND HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2021 is HEREBY CONTINUED to 4/14/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Western Digital Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/21/2021. Replies due by 10/28/2021. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davilafor all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2021)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Western Digital Corporation.. (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Digital Corporation (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 9/20/2021)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/14/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint ) filed byJeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent, Kevin Riordan, Nagui Sorial. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Edward Cole ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Scott Edward Cole ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time, #3 Proposed Order re: Defendant's Administrative Motion to Enlarge Time)(Cole, Scott) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Western Digital Corporation. Responses due by 9/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erin E. Meyer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Reiss Green (Green, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna A. Porto (Porto, Anna) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Meyer (Meyer, Erin) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Paul Ragland (Ragland, Steven) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent, Kevin Riordan, Nagui Sorial.. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Jeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent, Kevin Riordan, Nagui Sorial of Change of Law Firm Name (Van Note, Laura) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Jeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent, Kevin Riordan, Nagui Sorial of Change of Law Firm Name (Van Note, Laura) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Western Digital Corporation. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/20/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cole, Scott) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, INJUNCTIVE AND EQUITABLE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16258388.). Filed byNagui Sorial, Kevin Riordan, Jeremy Bobo, Ashley Laurent. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cole, Scott) (Filed on 8/6/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riordan et al v. Western Digital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Riordan
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Laura Grace Van Note
Represented By: Cody Alexander Bolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Laurent
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Laura Grace Van Note
Represented By: Cody Alexander Bolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Bobo
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Laura Grace Van Note
Represented By: Cody Alexander Bolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagui Sorial
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Represented By: Laura Grace Van Note
Represented By: Cody Alexander Bolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Digital Corporation
Represented By: Steven Paul Ragland
Represented By: Anna A. Porto
Represented By: Erin E. Meyer
Represented By: Nicholas Reiss Green
Represented By: Reaghan E. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?