Hart v. Lake County Sheriff et al
Plaintiff: Peter Irving Hart
Defendant: Lake County Sheriff and Medical Dept. of Lake County Jail
Case Number: 5:2021cv06511
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
2 Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 09/08/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Peter Irving Hart. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2021)
August 24, 2021 Sent copy of #3 to plaintiff. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/30/2021. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Irving Hart. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lake County Sheriff, Medical Dept. of Lake County Jail. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byPeter Irving Hart. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Lake County Sheriff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Irving Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Dept. of Lake County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?