Taylor Farms California, Inc. v. Carioto Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Farms California, Inc.
Defendant: Carioto Produce, Inc., Gregory Carioto and Anthony Carioto
Case Number: 5:2021cv06721
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Taylor Farms California, Inc. re 13 Clerk's Notice, (Botta, Bart) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 11/30/21 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.The Initial Case Management Conference on 11/30/21 at 9:30am is VACATED. Plaintiff Taylor Farms California, Inc. is ordered to file a motion for default judgment within 30 days by no later than November 24, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2021)
October 18, 2021 Filing 12 Clerk's Notice of ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants, Carioto Produce, Inc., Gregory Carioto, Anthony Carioto on October 18, 2021. (Related documents(s) #11 )(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk Against All Defendants; Declaration of Bart M. Botta in Support filed by Taylor Farms California, Inc.. (Botta, Bart) (Filed on 10/12/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Taylor Farms California, Inc... (Botta, Bart) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Farms California, Inc.. Anthony Carioto served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Botta, Bart) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Farms California, Inc.. Gregory Carioto served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Botta, Bart) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taylor Farms California, Inc.. Carioto Produce, Inc. served on 9/3/2021, answer due 9/24/2021. (Botta, Bart) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Anthony Carioto, Gregory Carioto, Carioto Produce, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Taylor Farms California, Inc. (Botta, Bart) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Botta, Bart) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act (PACA) [7 U.S.C. 499e, et seq. against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16337465.). Filed byTaylor Farms California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Botta, Bart) (Filed on 8/30/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Farms California, Inc. v. Carioto Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Farms California, Inc.
Represented By: Bart Mark Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carioto Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Carioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Carioto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?