Brown v. Atchley et al
Plaintiff: Darnell Brown, Jr.
Defendant: Atchley and Conway
Case Number: 5:2021cv06929
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: PSLC HHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT TO DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/12/2021. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Darnell Brown, Jr. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darnell Brown, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Sent copy of #2 and #3 to plaintiff. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/15/2021. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Atchley, Conway. (IFPP) No Process. Filed byDarnell Brown, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Atchley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atchley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?