United States of America v. The real property located at 577 S. Tradition Street, Mountain House, CA; APN 254-160-340 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The real property located at 577 S. Tradition Street, Mountain House, CA; APN 254-160-340, The real property located at 135 E Kavanagh Avenue, Tracy, CA; APN 214-400-370, The real property located at 332 R Street, Merced, CA; 032-261-018; APN: 032-261-018, The real property located at 4452 Cotton Court, Apartments 1-12, Stockton, CA; APN:104-260-060, The real property located at 1185 Palomar Drive, Tracy, CA; APN 238-110-080, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 1916-6482 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 1191-9368 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 3452-2348 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD 401K Plan & Trust DTD, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 4658-1251 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 8018-0595 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD Pension Plan, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 7911-3030 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD Defined Benefit Pension Plan, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 7912-2543 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD 401K Plan & Trust DTD FBO Sherry L. Smith, All funds maintained at Jackson National Life Insurance Company in annuity number 1022081175 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD Pension Plan, All funds maintained at Jackson National Life Insurance Company in annuity account number 1020906533 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD, All funds maintained at American Funds College America VA 529 account number 04000677405 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD for the benefit of Rachel S. Prasad, All funds maintained at American Funds College America VA 529 account number 04000676880 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD for the benefit of Aidan C. Prasad and All funds maintained at Voya Retirement Insurance and Annuity Company in IRA account number R079657-ZS held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD for the benefit of Sherry Smith, Rachel Prasad, and Aidan Pr
Claimant: Tri Counties Bank
Case Number: 5:2021cv07461
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/22/2021)
November 19, 2021 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Civil Case filed by United States of America and Potential Claimant Dhirendra Prasad. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/19/2021) Modified on 11/22/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #16 Proposed Warrant, #24 Service by Publication, #15 Proposed Warrant, #8 Proposed Warrant, #7 Proposed Warrant, #13 Proposed Warrant, #11 Proposed Warrant, #14 Proposed Warrant, #10 Proposed Warrant, #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, #4 Notice (Other), #6 Proposed Warrant, #9 Proposed Warrant, #12 Proposed Warrant, #22 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #5 Proposed Warrant (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 17, 2021 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #16 Proposed Warrant, #24 Service by Publication, #15 Proposed Warrant, #8 Proposed Warrant, #7 Proposed Warrant, #13 Proposed Warrant, #11 Proposed Warrant, #14 Proposed Warrant, #10 Proposed Warrant, #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, #4 Notice (Other), #6 Proposed Warrant, #9 Proposed Warrant, #12 Proposed Warrant, #22 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #5 Proposed Warrant (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/17/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #21 Notice of Lis Pendens (Notice of Posting) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #20 Notice of Lis Pendens (Notice of Posting) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #19 Notice of Lis Pendens (Notice of Posting) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #18 Notice of Lis Pendens (Notice of Posting) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 15, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #17 Notice of Lis Pendens (Notice of Posting) (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/15/2021)
November 11, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by TRI COUNTIES BANK, COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America byTri Counties Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wechsler, Glenn) (Filed on 11/11/2021)
November 11, 2021 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tri Counties Bank.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wechsler, Glenn) (Filed on 11/11/2021)
November 9, 2021 Filing 24 Proof of Publication of Notice of Forfeiture Action filed by United States of America. Last publication date 11/06/2021. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 11/9/2021) Modified on 11/9/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REQUESTING Plaintiff Provide Status re: Consent of Defendants and Claimants. Status Report due by 11/22/2021. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/8/2021. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Karen D. Beausey (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Karen D. Beausey (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Karen D. Beausey (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Karen D. Beausey (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Karen D. Beausey (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 15 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 14 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Warrant. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Forfeiture Action by United States of America. (Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/27/2021) Modified on 9/28/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Pitman (Pitman, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/8/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem against All funds maintained at American Funds College America VA 529 account number 04000676880 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD for the benefit of Aidan C. Prasad, All funds maintained at American Funds College America VA 529 account number 04000677405 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD for the benefit of Rachel S. Prasad, All funds maintained at Jackson National Life Insurance Company in annuity account number 1020906533 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD 10/22/2010, All funds maintained at Jackson National Life Insurance Company in annuity number 1022081175 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD Pension Plan, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 1191-9368 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD 10/22/2010, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 1916-6482 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD 10/22/2010, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 3452-2348 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD 401K Plan & Trust DTD 11/10/16, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 4658-1251 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD 10/22/2010, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 7911-3030 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD Defined Benefit Pension Plan, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 7912-2543 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD 401K Plan & Trust DTD 11-10-16 FBO Sherry L. Smith, All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 8018-0595 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD Pension Plan, All funds maintained at Voya Retirement Insurance and Annuity Company in IRA account number R079657-ZS held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD for the benefit of Sherry Smith, Rachel Prasad, and Aidan Pr, The real property located at 1185 Palomar Drive, Tracy, CA; APN 238-110-080, The real property located at 135 E Kavanagh Avenue, Tracy, CA; APN 214-400-370, The real property located at 332 R Street, Merced, CA; 032-261-018; APN: 032-261-018, The real property located at 4452 Cotton Court, Apartments 1-12, Stockton, CA; APN:104-260-060, The real property located at 577 S. Tradition Street, Mountain House, CA; APN 254-160-340. Filed byUnited States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beausey, Karen) (Filed on 9/24/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The real property located at 577 S. Tradition Street, Mountain House, CA; APN 254-160-340 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael G. Pitman
Represented By: Karen D. Beausey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property located at 577 S. Tradition Street, Mountain House, CA; APN 254-160-340
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property located at 135 E Kavanagh Avenue, Tracy, CA; APN 214-400-370
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property located at 332 R Street, Merced, CA; 032-261-018; APN: 032-261-018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property located at 4452 Cotton Court, Apartments 1-12, Stockton, CA; APN:104-260-060
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property located at 1185 Palomar Drive, Tracy, CA; APN 238-110-080
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 1916-6482 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 1191-9368 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 3452-2348 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD 401K Plan & Trust DTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 4658-1251 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 8018-0595 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 7911-3030 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD Defined Benefit Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at LPL Financial in account 7912-2543 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD 401K Plan & Trust DTD FBO Sherry L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at Jackson National Life Insurance Company in annuity number 1022081175 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD Pension Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at Jackson National Life Insurance Company in annuity account number 1020906533 held in the name of The PRASAD-Smith Living Trust DTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at American Funds College America VA 529 account number 04000677405 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD for the benefit of Rachel S. Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at American Funds College America VA 529 account number 04000676880 held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD for the benefit of Aidan C. Prasad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds maintained at Voya Retirement Insurance and Annuity Company in IRA account number R079657-ZS held in the name of Dhirendra PRASAD for the benefit of Sherry Smith, Rachel Prasad, and Aidan Pr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tri Counties Bank
Represented By: Glenn Harlan Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?