Unicorn Energy GmbH v. Tesla, Inc.
Plaintiff: Unicorn Energy GmbH
Defendant: Tesla Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Shane A Nelson
Case Number: 5:2021cv07476
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 93 Certificate of Interested Entities by Tesla Inc. (Pivovar, Adam) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 19, 2021 Filing 92 Certificate of Interested Entities by Unicorn Energy GmbH identifying Corporate Parent Prei Beteiligungs GmbH, Corporate Parent MasterMind Advisory Services GmbH, Corporate Parent Eccommunio Betriebs UG & Co. KG, Corporate Parent Kappa Holding GmbH for Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 19, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David Isaac Gindler (Gindler, David) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 7, 2021 Filing 90 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 10/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 88 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
October 4, 2021 Filing 87 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Unicorn Energy GmbH.. (Gindler, David) (Filed on 10/4/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 86 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 85 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2021 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Filing 84 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00338. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2021 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth L. DeRieux by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER. The Court has received Mr Nelson's invoice for services through August 25, 2021 in the amount of $19,265.25 and hereby Orders payment to be promptly made as follows: Plaintiff: $9,632.63. Defendants: $9,632.63. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/9/2021. (bjc, )
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER withdrawing #54 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BY PATENT RULE 3-4(a) filed by Unicorn Energy GmbH. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/3/2021. (slo, )
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that the above-captioned case is TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/03/2021. (klc, )
September 2, 2021 Filing 79 STATUS REPORT (Joint) and Withdrawal of Motion to Compel by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 26, 2021 Filing 78 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Tesla, Inc. for proceedings held on August 25, 2021 Markman before Judge Roy S. Payne. (Keefe, Heidi) (Main Document 78 replaced with flattened image. Forwarded to Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts on 8/26/2021.) (bas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE by Unicorn Energy GmbH of Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hearing Slides)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 25, 2021 Filing 76 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Unicorn Energy GmbH for proceedings held on August 25, 2021 Markman Hearing before Judge Payne. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Forwarded to Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts on 8/26/2021.) (bas)
August 25, 2021 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 8/25/2021. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Leave to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/23/2021. (nkl, )
August 23, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing set for 8/25/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga)
August 20, 2021 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AMENDED INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #71 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/18/2021. (nkl, )
August 13, 2021 Filing 71 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #69 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Scheduling Order,, by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2021 Filing 70 P.R. 4-5(d) Joint Claim Construction Chart by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing set for 8/25/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #66 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #27 Order. Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2021., Jury Selection set for 4/4/2022 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 8/27/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 2/14/2022., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2022. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/6/2021. (ch, )
August 6, 2021 Filing 68 REPLY to #63 Claim Construction Brief, #67 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dillard)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2021 Filing 67 DEFENDANT TESLA, INC.'S RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark Ehsani, Ph.D., #2 Affidavit Heidi L. Keefe, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23)(Keefe, Heidi)
July 30, 2021 Filing 66 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #27 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Scheduling Order, by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - Shane Nelson be appointed as the Courts technical advisor in the above-captioned case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/21/2021. (nkl, )
July 20, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 8/25/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF LIMITED REFERRAL - Order Referring Case for Claim Construction Purposes Only. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/2021. (ch, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 63 P.R. 4-5(a) OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dillard, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Affidavit Frischling, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jasper L Tran on behalf of Unicorn Energy GmbH. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8495277. (Tran, Jasper)
June 4, 2021 Filing 61 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 28, 2021 Filing 60 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #54 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BY PATENT RULE 3-4(a) filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Dacus, Deron)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #53 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 27 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Scheduling Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/21/2021. (ch, )
May 19, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE by Tesla, Inc. of 4-2 Disclosures (Dacus, Deron)
May 17, 2021 Filing 57 REDACTION to #55 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, #54 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BY PATENT RULE 3-4(a) by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chow, #2 Affidavit Jonas, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Unicorn Energy GmbH re P.R. 4-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2021 Filing 55 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #54 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BY PATENT RULE 3-4(a). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jonas)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2021 Filing 54 * WITHDRAWN PER #81 ORDER * Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS REQUIRED BY PATENT RULE 3-4(a) by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chow, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/3/2021 (slo, ).
May 14, 2021 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #27 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Scheduling Order, by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 11, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Cannon Shrieves on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Shrieves, Elizabeth)
May 11, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Emily T Lilburn on behalf of Unicorn Energy GmbH. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8406422. (Lilburn, Emily)
April 26, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE by Tesla, Inc. of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Dacus, Deron)
April 23, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Unicorn Energy GmbH re P.R. 4-1 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 6, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE by Tesla, Inc. of Disclosures (Dacus, Deron)
April 5, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Unicorn Energy GmbH re E-Mail Custodians (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 25, 2021 Filing 46 REDACTION to #45 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion by Tesla, Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
March 23, 2021 Filing 45 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 Amended SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
March 18, 2021 Filing 44 REDACTION to #43 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,,,, by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jonas, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit PP, #44 Exhibit QQ, #45 Exhibit RR, #46 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2021 Filing 43 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #12 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jonas, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit LL, #40 Exhibit MM, #41 Exhibit NN, #42 Exhibit OO, #43 Exhibit PP, #44 Exhibit QQ, #45 Exhibit RR, #46 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 12 MOTION to Change Venue and File An Amended Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/2021. (ch, )
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY granting #40 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed E-Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/2021. (ch, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed E-Discovery Order by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 25, 2021 Filing 39 REDACTION to #37 Amended SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration - Fang, #3 Exhibit 1 to Fang Declaration, #4 Declaration - Wood, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17)(Dacus, Deron)
February 23, 2021 Filing 38 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint by Tesla, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
February 23, 2021 Filing 37 Amended SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration-Fang, #3 Exhibit 1 to Fang Declaration, #4 Declaration-Wood, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17)(Dacus, Deron)
February 19, 2021 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #12 MOTION to Change Venue and File An Amended Motion to Transfer Venue by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/2021. (nkl, )
February 12, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 34, STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 FILED IN ERROR STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/11/2021. (nkl, ) Modified on 2/12/2021 (nkl, ).
February 11, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE by Tesla, Inc. of Compliance (Dacus, Deron)
February 11, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Unicorn Energy GmbH re Initial and Additional Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 10, 2021 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 9, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Unicorn Energy GmbH re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 9, 2021 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Tesla, Inc., filed by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '869 Patent)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DISCOVERY ORDER re #26 Motion for Entry of Proposed Agreed Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/2021. (nkl, )
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re #25 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order filed by Unicorn Energy GmbH., Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2021., Markman Hearing set for 8/27/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 2/14/2022., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2022. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/8/2021. (nkl, )
February 3, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Discovery Order by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 3, 2021 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 20, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 1/20/2021. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave the parties Markman and Jury Selection dates. (Court Reporter Susan Zielie, RMR, FCRR.) (aeb)
January 13, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Adam M Pivovar on behalf of Tesla, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8196029. (Pivovar, Adam)
January 13, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Samuel K Whitt on behalf of Tesla, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8194695. (Whitt, Samuel)
January 12, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alissa Wood on behalf of Tesla, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8193340. (Wood, Alissa)
January 11, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael G Rhodes on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Rhodes, Michael)
January 8, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
January 7, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Tesla, Inc. (Dacus, Shannon)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend Date for Opposition to Motion to Transfer, to Provide for Early Forum-Related Discovery and a Corresponding Extension of Date of Early Exchange of Materials. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/5/2021. (nkl, )
December 30, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Change Venue TO PROVIDE FOR EARLY FORUM-RELATED DISCOVERY AND FOR A CORRESPONDING EXTENSION OF DATE OF EARLY EXCHANGE OF MATERIALS by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2021 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/22/2020. (ch, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Unicorn Energy GmbH (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tesla, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
December 17, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tesla, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
December 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Change Venue by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration-Marsh, #3 Declaration_WOOD, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13)(Dacus, Deron)
November 12, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Tesla, Inc. to 12/17/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Tesla, Inc..( Alm, Joseph)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gary N Frischling on behalf of Unicorn Energy GmbH. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8093610. (Frischling, Gary)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sean Hyberg on behalf of Unicorn Energy GmbH. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8092075. (Hyberg, Sean)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David I Gindler on behalf of Unicorn Energy GmbH. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8091386. (Gindler, David)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David C Jonas on behalf of Unicorn Energy GmbH. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8091361. (Jonas, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2020: #1 Sealed Attachment) (saenz, ).
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Unicorn Energy GmbH. Tesla, Inc. served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Tesla, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center. (nkl, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Unicorn Energy GmbH identifying Corporate Parent Prei Beteiligungs GmbH for Unicorn Energy GmbH. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Tesla, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-8072684.), filed by Unicorn Energy GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '869 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
October 26, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicorn Energy GmbH v. Tesla, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicorn Energy GmbH
Represented By: David I Gindler
Represented By: David C Jonas
Represented By: Emily T Lilburn
Represented By: Gary N. Frischling
Represented By: Jasper L Tran
Represented By: Sean Hyberg
Represented By: Elizabeth DeRieux
Represented By: David Isaac Gindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Adam M Pivovar
Represented By: Alissa Wood
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Elizabeth Cannon Shrieves
Represented By: Joseph Caleb Alm
Represented By: Samuel K Whitt
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Adam Mathew Pivovar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Shane A Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?