Terrestrial Development LLC v. CalCap Lending, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Terrestrial Development LLC
Defendant: CalCap Lending, LLC, FCI Lender Services, Inc. and California TD Specialists
Case Number: 5:2021cv07992
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY (re #5 MOTION to Change Venue ) filed byCalCap Lending, LLC, California TD Specialists, FCI Lender Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Byron B. Mauss in Support of Defendants' Reply to Opposition of Plaintiff to Motion for Transfer of Venue)(Mauss, Byron) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Motion #5 to Change Venue Hearing is set for 3/31/2022 9:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The Motion briefing schedule remains unchanged. See Civil L.R. 7-7(d). Initial Case Management Conference is set for 5/5/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2022 before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 12 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION to Change Venue ) filed by Terrestrial Development LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Shapero in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Transfer of Venue (28 U.S.C. 1412))(Shapero, Sarah) (Filed on 11/2/2021) Modified on 11/3/2021 (anj, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins assigned for Discovery purposes only. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by clerk on 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 28, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Terrestrial Development LLC.. (Shapero, Sarah) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/3/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CalCap Lending, LLC, California TD Specialists, FCI Lender Services, Inc. re 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Mauss, Byron) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Declaration of Byron B. Mauss in Support of #5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by CalCap Lending, LLC, California TD Specialists, FCI Lender Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Mauss, Byron) (Filed on 10/18/2021) Modified on 10/19/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue filed by CalCap Lending, LLC, California TD Specialists, FCI Lender Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2021 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 11/1/2021. Replies due by 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Transfer of Venue)(Mauss, Byron) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by CalCap Lending, LLC, California TD Specialists, FCI Lender Services, Inc... (Mauss, Byron) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/27/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 13, 2021 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Michele Sabo Assayag. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by California TD Specialists, FCI Lender Services, Inc., CalCap Lending, LLC (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2021)
October 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF LAWSUIT PENDING IN STATE COURT TO DISTRICT COURT (28 U.S.C. Section 1452) from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV367652. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16489303). Filed byCalifornia TD Specialists, FCI Lender Services, Inc., CalCap Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mauss, Byron) (Filed on 10/12/2021)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrestrial Development LLC v. CalCap Lending, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrestrial Development LLC
Represented By: Brenna Wood Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CalCap Lending, LLC
Represented By: Byron B Mauss
Represented By: Michele A Assayag,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Lender Services, Inc.
Represented By: Byron B Mauss
Represented By: Michele A Assayag,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California TD Specialists
Represented By: Byron B Mauss
Represented By: Michele A Assayag,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?