Rodriguez v. BELFOR USA Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Rodriguez
Defendant: BELFOR USA Group, Inc., BELFOR Environmental, Inc., Oakwood Construction and Restoration Services, Inc. and 1 800 Water Damage North America, LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv02071
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING IN COURT HEARING AND DESIGNATING COURTROOM. Please take NOTICE that the Motion Hearing Re #5 Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Strike will be held in person and is set for 5/31/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 12 REPLY (re #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike ) filed by1 800 Water Damage North America, LLC, BELFOR Environmental, Inc., Oakwood Construction and Restoration Services, Inc.. (Fontaine, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 21, 2022 Filing 11 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(6) AND TO STRIKE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(f) (re #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike ) filed byRichard Rodriguez. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2022) Modified on 4/22/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Sing Lee (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/21/2022)
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BELFOR USA Group, Inc. (Fontaine, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard Rodriguez.. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 14, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BELFOR USA Group, Inc... (Fontaine, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Strike filed by 1 800 Water Damage North America, LLC, BELFOR Environmental, Inc., Oakwood Construction and Restoration Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 4/21/2022. Replies due by 4/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer M. Fontaine, #2 Exhibit with Request for Judicial Notice)(Fontaine, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/7/2022)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by 1 800 Water Damage North America, LLC, BELFOR Environmental, Inc., Oakwood Construction and Restoration Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BELFOR Holdings, Inc. for 1 800 Water Damage North America, LLC, BELFOR Environmental, Inc., BELFOR USA Group, Inc., Oakwood Construction and Restoration Services, Inc.. (Fontaine, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/1/2022)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/28/202 2. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/5/2022 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/14/2022. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2022)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court with jury demand (no process). Their case number is 22CV394662. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17046235). Filed by Oakwood Construction and Restoration Services, Inc., BELFOR Environmental, Inc., BELFOR USA Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fontaine, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/31/2022) Modified on 3/31/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. BELFOR USA Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert Joseph Drexler, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Sing Lee
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELFOR USA Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Fontaine
Represented By: E. Joseph Connaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELFOR Environmental, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Fontaine
Represented By: E. Joseph Connaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakwood Construction and Restoration Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Fontaine
Represented By: E. Joseph Connaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 800 Water Damage North America, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Fontaine
Represented By: E. Joseph Connaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?