CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv02553
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 122 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17294092.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Nguyen, Anthony) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 121 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #120 MOTION to Shorten Time on Apple Inc.'s Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review or in the Alternative Stay Briefing on CPC's Summary Judgment Motion ) filed byCPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Summerfield, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Timm, Zachary) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 14, 2022 Filing 120 Motion to Stay Pending #119 Inter Partes Review or in the Alternative Stay Briefing on CPC's 86 Summary Judgment Motion filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Sproul, Seth) (Filed on 6/14/2022) Modified on 6/15/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2022 Filing 119 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2022 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 6/28/2022. Replies due by 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Sproul, Seth) (Filed on 6/14/2022)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting #117 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kathryn Quisenberry. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/13/2022. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 10, 2022 Filing 117 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17161414.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Quisenberry, Kathryn) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting #108 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joy Backer Kete. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/6/2022. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting #107 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jonah B. Heemstra. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/6/2022. (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 6, 2022 Filing 114 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Motion Hearing: Hearing on 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment set for 11/17/2022 at 9:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 6, 2022 Filing 113 NOTICE re 86 Sealed Motion Plaintiff CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. filed byCPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.. (Related document(s) 86 ) (Timm, Zachary) (Filed on 5/6/2022) Modified text on 5/6/2022, (to conform with document posted by counsel) (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2022 Filing 112 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 8/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings re #110 Order of Recusal. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/6/2022. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
May 5, 2022 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Summerfield (Summerfield, George) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Filing 108 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17150298.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Kete, Joy) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Filing 107 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17148997.) filed by CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.. (Heemstra, Jonah) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Noel Goodrich (Goodrich, Christina) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 104 Certificate of Interested Entities by CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Charter Pacific Corporation Limited for CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.. (Timm, Zachary) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary T. Timm (Timm, Zachary) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 4, 2022 Filing 101 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Sproul, Seth) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 2, 2022 Filing 100 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. (Sproul, Seth) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Betty Hong Chen (Chen, Betty) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 98 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Sproul, Seth) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey H Burton (Burton, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 28, 2022 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth McCarthy Sproul (Sproul, Seth) (Filed on 4/28/2022)
April 27, 2022 Filing 95 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING Initial Case Management Conference to 5/18/2022, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Dial-in: 888.684.8852. Access code: 1557087. Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2022. All parties are requested to file their consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 5/11/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 27, 2022 Filing 94 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 27, 2022 Filing 93 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-00165. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #22 Motion to Change Venue entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be transferred to the Northern District of California. This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
April 22, 2022 Filing 92 Federal Circuit ORDER Vacating #74 Sealed Order. The district courts February 8, 2022 order is vacated, and the district court is directed to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (lad)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
April 13, 2022 Filing 90 NOTICE Notice of Unopposed Extension of Deadline to File Response by Apple Inc. re #86 Sealed Motion Plaintiff CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd., #87 Sealed Document,,, (Ravel, J.)
April 13, 2022 Filing 89 Redacted Copy of Declaration of William C. Easttom II in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of #87 Sealed Document,,, by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Easttom Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 to Easttom Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 to Easttom Decl., #4 Exhibit 4 to Easttom Decl., #5 Exhibit 5 to Easttom Decl., #6 Exhibit 6 to Easttom Decl., #7 Exhibit 7 to Easttom Decl., #8 Exhibit 8 to Easttom Decl., #9 Exhibit 9 to Easttom Decl., #10 Exhibit 10 to Easttom Decl., #11 Exhibit 11 to Easttom Decl.)(Shimota, James)
April 13, 2022 Filing 88 Redacted Copy of #86 Sealed Motion Plaintiff CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George C. Summerfield, #2 Exhibit A to Summerfield Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Summerfield Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Summerfield Decl.)(Shimota, James)
April 6, 2022 Filing 87 Sealed Document: Declaration of William C. Easttom II in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of #86 Sealed Motion Plaintiff CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Easttom Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 to Easttom Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 to Easttom Decl., #4 Exhibit 4 to Easttom Decl., #5 Exhibit 5 to Easttom Decl., #6 Exhibit 6 to Easttom Decl., #7 Exhibit 7 to Easttom Decl., #8 Exhibit 8 to Easttom Decl., #9 Exhibit 9 to Easttom Decl., #10 Exhibit 10 to Easttom Decl., #11 Exhibit 11 to Easttom Decl.) (Shimota, James)
April 6, 2022 Filing 86 Sealed Motion Plaintiff CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George C. Summerfield, #2 Exhibit A to Summerfield Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Summerfield Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Summerfield Decl.) (Shimota, James)
March 16, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE of Compliance re Final Invalidity Contentions by Apple Inc. (Sproul, Seth)
March 10, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE of Inter Partes Review Petitions by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. (Shimota, James)
March 10, 2022 Filing 83 United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit ORDER directing CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. to respond to the petition no later than seven days from the date of filing of this order. (lad)
March 10, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #79 Motion to Withdraw the 45 Motion to Dismiss for lack of Standing. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
February 17, 2022 Filing 81 ATTACHMENT Amended Exhibits F (Dkt. 1-6) and H (Dkt. 1-8) to #1 Complaint, by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Amended] Exhibit F to Complaint (Dkt. 1-6), #2 Exhibit [Amended] Exhibit H to Complaint (Dkt. 1-8))(Shimota, James)
February 15, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE of Asserted Claims by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. (Gilman, Elizabeth)
February 14, 2022 Filing 79 CORRECTED MOTION to Withdraw 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Anthony)
February 14, 2022 Filing 78 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #77 Notice (Other) (jc5)
February 14, 2022 Filing 77 NOTICE to Withdraw Motion by Apple Inc. re 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (Nguyen, Anthony)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
February 10, 2022 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Markman Hearing held on 2/10/2022. Case called for Markman Hearing. Counsel for the parties entered appearances. Claim terms were discussed. The Court advised the stay regarding discovery ends today. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (jc5)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PUBLIC VERSION OF #74 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ***VACATED by #92 Federal Circuit Order*** Sealed Order denying #22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5) Modified on 4/22/2022 (lad). Modified on 4/22/2022 (lad).
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #44 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Alan D Albright because the motion is unopposed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hannah L. Cannom. Attorney added for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bethany Stevens. Attorney added for Apple Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
February 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
February 4, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Apple Inc. (Ravel, J.)
February 4, 2022 Filing 70 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Hannah L. Cannom ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15683241) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.) (Main Document 70 replaced on 2/25/2022) (jc5).
February 4, 2022 Filing 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Bethany Stevens ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15682703) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
February 3, 2022 Filing 68 STATUS REPORT (Third) Pursuant to Second Amended Standing Order Regarding Motions for Inter District Transfer by Apple Inc.. (Quisenberry, Kathryn)
January 28, 2022 Filing 67 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Apple Inc..(Nguyen, Anthony)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #63 Motion to Withdraw Dhohyung Kim Attorney. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
January 25, 2022 Filing 65 ATTACHMENT (Corrected Proposed Order) to #63 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dhohyung Kim by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Gilman, Elizabeth)
January 25, 2022 Filing 64 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #63 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dhohyung Kim. Pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Proceedings Dated 10/8/2021. The proposed Order shall omit the word Proposed from the title. Resubmit the Order using the Attachment event and link to the motion. (ir)
January 25, 2022 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Dhohyung Kim by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilman, Elizabeth)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ben Roxborough. Attorney added for CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jzda)
January 19, 2022 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Abbott Gilman for Ben Roxborough ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15628776) by on behalf of CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Gilman, Elizabeth)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonah Heemstra. Attorney added for CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sjda) (Main Document 60 replaced on 1/25/2022) (sv).
January 14, 2022 Filing 59 ATTACHMENT Amended Exhibit J (Dkt. 1-10) to #1 Complaint, by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Amended] Exhibit J to Complaint)(Shimota, James)
January 14, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Abbott Gilman for Jonah Heemstra ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15617771) by on behalf of CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gilman, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2022 Filing 57 Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Shimota, James)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #50 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #39 Motion for Protective Order. Entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER, (Markman Hearing set for 2/10/2022 03:00 PM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
January 5, 2022 Filing 54 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #52 Claim Construction Brief by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Shimota, James)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, (Markman Hearing set for 1/25/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
December 22, 2021 Filing 52 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #49 Brief by Apple Inc.. (Sproul, Seth)
December 17, 2021 Filing 51 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to Second Amended Standing Order Regarding Motions for Inter-District Transfer by Apple Inc.. (Sproul, Seth)
December 10, 2021 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #48 Response in Opposition to Motion, 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Apple Inc.. (Sproul, Seth)
December 8, 2021 Filing 49 BRIEF (Plaintiff's Responsive Claim Construction Brief) regarding #46 Claim Construction Brief by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Shimota, James)
December 3, 2021 Filing 48 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd., re 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Steven Cole, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jonah Heemstra)(Shimota, James)
November 23, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE to the Court of Unopposed Extension by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. re 45 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (Shimota, James)
November 19, 2021 Filing 46 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kathryn Quisenberry, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Sproul, Seth)
November 3, 2021 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Supplement in Support of Its Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Plaintiff's Supplement in Support of Its Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Defendant's Preliminary Invalidity Contentions, #3 Exhibit Ex C - HMD's Preliminary Invalidity Contentions, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Comparison)(Gilman, Elizabeth)
October 27, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE of Compliance by Apple Inc. (Sproul, Seth)
October 21, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Transfer by Apple Inc. re #22 MOTION to Change Venue (Sproul, Seth)
October 13, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Compliance by Apple Inc. (Sproul, Seth)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
October 4, 2021 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sproul, Seth)
September 29, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Compliance by Apple Inc. (Sproul, Seth)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 1/19/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 3/2/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 5/11/2022. Motions due by 10/5/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Jury Selection set for 1/23/2023 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2023 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (jc5)
September 22, 2021 Filing 36 Proposed Scheduling Order (Agreed) by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Shimota, James)
September 1, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Apple Inc. (Sproul, Seth)
August 25, 2021 Filing 34 Redacted Copy Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California of #32 Sealed Document, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Sproul, Seth)
August 23, 2021 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT On Apple Inc.'s Fully-Briefed Motion for Inter-District Transfer Ready for Resolution by Apple Inc.. (Sproul, Seth)
August 18, 2021 Filing 32 Sealed Document: Reply In Support of Motion to Transfer of #30 Sealed Document, by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Declaration of Seth M. Sproul, #2 Exhibit A - CPC Prelim Infringement Contentions, #3 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Dart Depo, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of David Murray) (Sproul, Seth)
August 11, 2021 Filing 31 Redacted Copy of #30 Sealed Document, by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Shimota, James)
August 4, 2021 Filing 30 Sealed Document: Plaintiff CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.'s Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California of #22 MOTION to Change Venue by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Nounbissi Dep. Tr., #2 Exhibit 2 - Rollins Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit 3 - Jerudandi Dep. Tr., #4 Exhibit 4 - Hawkins Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - Rollins Verification) (Shimota, James)
July 1, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eda Stark on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney Eda Stark added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Stark, Eda)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
May 27, 2021 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT (Case Readiness) by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Gilman, Elizabeth)
May 26, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Apple Inc., re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Sproul, Seth)
May 19, 2021 Filing 25 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd., re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Letter (05.06.2021))(Gilman, Elizabeth)
May 19, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Geuneul Yang by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sproul, Seth)
May 6, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sproul, Seth)
May 4, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Change Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order)(Sproul, Seth)
March 29, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Apple Inc. answer due 5/6/2021. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc.. (Sproul, Seth)
March 19, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sproul, Seth)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anthony Van Nguyen for Apple Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Seth M. Sproul for Apple Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joy B. Kete for Apple Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Geuneul Yang for Apple Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 17, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin C. Elacqua for Anthony Van Nguyen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14602226) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elacqua, Benjamin)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathryn A. Quisenberry on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney Kathryn A. Quisenberry added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Quisenberry, Kathryn)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Betty H. Chen on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney Betty H. Chen added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Chen, Betty)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin C. Elacqua for Geuneul Yang ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14598840) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elacqua, Benjamin)
March 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin C. Elacqua for Joy B. Kete ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14598839) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elacqua, Benjamin)
March 16, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin C. Elacqua for Seth M. Sproul ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14598834) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Elacqua, Benjamin)
March 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin C. Elacqua on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney Benjamin C. Elacqua added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Elacqua, Benjamin)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dhohyung Kim for CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James A. Shimota for CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney George C. Summerfield for CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. Apple Inc. served on 3/1/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Mesher, Stewart)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Abbott Gilman for James A. Shimota ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14522636) by on behalf of CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Gilman, Elizabeth)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Abbott Gilman for Dhohyung Kim ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14522616) by on behalf of CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Gilman, Elizabeth)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Abbott Gilman for George C. Summerfield ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14522461) by on behalf of CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Gilman, Elizabeth)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (bw)
February 23, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Mesher, Stewart)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mesher, Stewart)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Mesher, Stewart)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14516271), filed by CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mesher, Stewart)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness v2.1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CPC Patent Technologies Pty Ltd. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CPC Patent Technologies PTY Ltd.
Represented By: Ben Roxborough
Represented By: Dhohyung Kim
Represented By: George C. Summerfield
Represented By: James A. Shimota
Represented By: Jonah Heemstra
Represented By: Stewart Mesher
Represented By: Elizabeth Abbott Gilman
Represented By: Christina Noel Goodrich
Represented By: Zachary T. Timm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Van Nguyen
Represented By: Bethany M. Stevens
Represented By: Geuneul Yang
Represented By: Hannah L. Cannom
Represented By: J Stephen Ravel
Represented By: Joy B. Kete
Represented By: Kelly Ransom
Represented By: Seth M Sproul
Represented By: Benjamin C. Elacqua
Represented By: Betty H. Chen
Represented By: Eda Stark
Represented By: Kathryn A. Quisenberry
Represented By: Betty Hong Chen
Represented By: Jeffrey H Burton
Represented By: Joy Backer Kete
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Quisenberry
Represented By: Seth McCarthy Sproul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?