Houtchens et al v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: Jenny Houtchens and Samantha Ramirez
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv02638
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 STIPULATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS FOR COMBINED MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRAITON AND MOTION TO DISMISS ***AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*** by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Page Limits for Google's Response to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Audrey Mott-Smith, #2 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)(Mott-Smith, Audrey) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/1/2022. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2022 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2022)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case, except for Discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google LLC.. (Mott-Smith, Audrey) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent ALPHABET, INC for Google LLC. (Mott-Smith, Audrey) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Google LLC. (Mott-Smith, Audrey) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey J. Mott-Smith for Defendant Google LLC (Mott-Smith, Audrey) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitty Somvichian for Defendant Google LLC (Somvichian, Whitty) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Carrie Doolin for Defendant Google LLC (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jenny Houtchens.. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenny Houtchens. Google LLC served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Gustafson, John) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2022)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Re: #4 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Samantha Ramirez, Jenny Houtchens (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/20 22)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jenny Houtchens, Samantha Ramirez as to Google LLC. Request for Summons (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 5/4/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/16/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against Google LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BCANDC-17134326.). Filed byJenny Houtchens, Samantha Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Gustafson, John) (Filed on 4/29/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houtchens et al v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Houtchens
Represented By: John Ryan Gustafson
Represented By: Steffan T. Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Ramirez
Represented By: John Ryan Gustafson
Represented By: Steffan T. Keeton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Audrey J. Mott-Smith
Represented By: Michelle Carrie Doolin
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?