Gordoa et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Gordoa, Ariani Reyes and B.G.
Defendant: Apple, Inc., Luxshare-ICT, Inc. and Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2022cv02900
Filed: May 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Gordoa. Luxshare-ICT, Inc. served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. (Paranjpe, Tej) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 22, 2022 Filing 23 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Luxshare-ICT, Inc.. (Blanche, Caitlin) (Filed on 6/22/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 22 JOINT STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO re #1 PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Apple, Inc.. (Schneider, Sara) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple, Inc. (Schneider, Sara) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 20 Summons Re-issued as to Defendant Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 15, 2022 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Carlos Gordoa as to Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.. (Paranjpe, Tej) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Gordoa. Apple, Inc. served on 6/1/2022, answer due 6/22/2022. (Paranjpe, Tej) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 13, 2022 Filing 17 Proposed Summons. (Paranjpe, Tej) (Filed on 6/13/2022)
June 3, 2022 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiffs are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge 6/17/2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
May 23, 2022 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Application for Admission of Attorney William Haacker Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number CCANDC-17193793) filed by Carlos Gordoa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Haacker, William) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Paranjpe, Tej) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #6 Application for Admission of Attorney Brent S. Phelps Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Application for Admission of Attorney Robert L. Horn Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Application for Admission of Attorney Tej Paranjpe Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc., Luxshare-ICT, Inc.. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17182987) filed by Carlos Gordoa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Phelps, Brent) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17182960) filed by Carlos Gordoa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Horn, Robert) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $317.00, receipt number ACANDC-17182909) filed by Carlos Gordoa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Paranjpe, Tej) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 17, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Collins, Richard) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17179707). Filed by Carlos Gordoa, B.G., Ariani Reyes. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Collins, Richard) (Filed on 5/16/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordoa et al v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gordoa
Represented By: Richard Thomas Collins
Represented By: Tej Paranjpe
Represented By: Brent Phelps
Represented By: Robert L. Horn
Represented By: William Haacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariani Reyes
Represented By: Richard Thomas Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.G.
Represented By: Richard Thomas Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Sara T. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxshare-ICT, Inc.
Represented By: Caitlin Comstock Blanche
Represented By: Damon M. Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxshare Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?