Scramoge Technology Limited v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Scramoge Technology Limited
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv03041
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Filing 81 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 80 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2022 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 79 CLERK'S NOTICE: Acknowledging receipt of case Transfer-In from the Western District of Texas, Case Number: 6:21-cv-00579-ADA. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022)
May 24, 2022 Filing 78 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-00579. Case file, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 5/24/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #71 Motion for extra pages entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Apple may expand the page limits from five to no more than eight in its reply to Scramoge's Sealed Response to Apples venue motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
May 2, 2022 Filing 76 BRIEF JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Cooper, Brett)
April 25, 2022 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT Status Report Pursuant to Second Amended Standing Order Regarding Motions for Inter-District Transfer by Apple Inc.. (Ravel, J.)
April 20, 2022 Filing 74 AMENDED ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, First Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Ravel, J.)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
April 13, 2022 Filing 72 Sealed Document: SEALED Reply ISO #37 SEALED Motion to Transfer Venue of #37 Sealed Motion SEALED Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc. by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Rollins Declaration) (Ravel, J.)
April 13, 2022 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION Unopposed Motion to Expand Page Limits for Reply re #37 Sealed Motion SEALED Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
April 12, 2022 Filing 70 STIPULATION Regarding Technical Tutorials by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Cooper, Brett)
April 1, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE Notice of Unopposed Extension of Deadline by Apple Inc. (Ravel, J.)
March 29, 2022 Filing 68 Redacted Public Version of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd.'s Opposition to Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) of #67 Sealed Document,, by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Drew Hollander, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 - Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Mirzaie, Reza)
March 22, 2022 Filing 67 Sealed Document: PLAINTIFF SCRAMOGE TECHNOLOGY LTD.S OPPOSITION TO APPLES MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) of #37 Sealed Motion SEALED Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc. by Scramoge Technology Limited (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Drew Hollander, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12) (Mirzaie, Reza)
March 10, 2022 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda)
March 8, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mansi H. Shah (Shah, Mansi)
March 7, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Deadline to Complete Jurisdictional Discovery by Scramoge Technology Limited re #37 Sealed Motion SEALED Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc., #55 Order, #39 Notice (Other), #59 Notice (Other), (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 28, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO SUBMIT JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT by Apple Inc. (Absher, Alton)
February 25, 2022 Filing 63 BRIEF /Scramoge's Sur Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #57 Claim Construction Brief by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Cooper, Brett)
February 25, 2022 Filing 62 BRIEF /Scramoge's Sur Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #58 Claim Construction Brief by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Drew Hollander, #2 Exhibit 5)(Cooper, Brett)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sv)
February 25, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Deadline to Submit Technical Tutorials by Scramoge Technology Limited re #56 Scheduling Order (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 17, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Deadline to Complete Jurisdictional Discovery by Scramoge Technology Limited re #37 Sealed Motion SEALED Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc., #55 Order, #39 Notice (Other) (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 11, 2022 Filing 58 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #43 Claim Construction Brief by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Brouillette Declaration, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(Ravel, J.)
February 11, 2022 Filing 57 Reply Claim Construction Brief regarding #44 Claim Construction Brief by Apple Inc.. (Ravel, J.)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 5/23/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (zv)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS VENUE INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
February 8, 2022 Filing 54 STATUS REPORT Status Report Pursuant to Second Amended Standing Order Regarding Motions for Inter-District Transfer by Apple Inc.. (Ravel, J.)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER, (Markman Hearing set for 3/8/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
February 4, 2022 Filing 52 CORRECTED MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order Jointly filed by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
February 4, 2022 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
February 4, 2022 Filing 50 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 2-3-22, Proceedings Transcribed: Discovery Hearing (Zoom). Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristie Davis, Telephone number: 254-340-6114, Email: kmdaviscsr@yahoo.com. (kd)
February 3, 2022 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Scramoge Technology Limited for proceedings held on 2/3/2022. Proceedings Transcribed: Discovery Hearing. Court Reporter: Kristie Davis. (Mirzaie, Reza)
February 3, 2022 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Discovery Hearing held on 2/3/2022. Case called for Discovery Hearing. The parties argued their discovery issues. The Court made ruling on the discovery issues. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(ir)
January 28, 2022 Filing 47 BRIEF RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF regarding #44 Claim Construction Brief by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Drew B. Hollander, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Cooper, Brett)
January 28, 2022 Filing 46 BRIEF RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF regarding #43 Claim Construction Brief by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Drew B. Hollander, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Cooper, Brett)
January 11, 2022 Filing 45 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN ASSERTED PATENT by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
January 7, 2022 Filing 44 Joint Claim Construction Brief or Statement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ravel, J.)
January 7, 2022 Filing 43 Opening Claim Construction Brief by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Brouillette Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Ravel, J.)
January 7, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of IPR Petitions by Scramoge Technology Limited re #34 Order (Mirzaie, Reza)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew W. Rinehart for Apple Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ir)
December 20, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE Notice of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Apple Inc. (Ravel, J.)
December 20, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Andrew W. Rinehart ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15551533) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
November 18, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Pending Venue Discovery by Scramoge Technology Limited re #37 Sealed Motion SEALED Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc. (Mirzaie, Reza)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #36 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Apple may expand the page limit for its Sealed Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) from fifteen pages to no more than eighteen pages. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
November 12, 2021 Filing 37 Sealed Motion SEALED Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mark Rollins Declaration, #2 Affidavit Mansi H. Shah Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Ravel, J.)
November 12, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Motion to Expand Page Limits by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
November 11, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of IPR Petitions by Scramoge Technology Limited re #34 Order (Mirzaie, Reza)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 3/8/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 4/5/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2022. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 12/6/2022. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (ir)
September 27, 2021 Filing 32 Proposed Scheduling Order by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mirzaie, Reza)
September 14, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Apple Inc..(Ravel, J.)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #28 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Limited withdrew its request for a permanent injunction as part of the relief for its claims of direct patent infringement. Accordingly, Defendants motion is GRANTED and Plaintiffs request for a permanent injunction is dismissed without prejudice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
August 30, 2021 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT Case Readiness Status Report by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
August 25, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS REQUEST FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Scramoge Technology Limited re #28 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Injunctive Relief Claims of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd (Mirzaie, Reza)
August 23, 2021 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Injunctive Relief Claims of Plaintiff Scramoge Technology Ltd by Apple Inc.. (Absher, Alton)
August 20, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Apple Inc. (Ravel, J.)
August 20, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Steven D. Moore ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15139434) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven D. Moore for Apple Inc. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jc5)
August 9, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 8/23/2021. (ls)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Alan D Albright. BE IT REMEMBERED on this day, there was presented to the Court the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint for Defendant Apple Inc. (Apple), and the Court, having reviewed the motion, enters the following order: IT IS ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is GRANTED, and Defendants deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended through and including August 23, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
August 6, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 Amended Complaint, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
July 20, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Apple Inc. (Ravel, J.)
July 20, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Christopher P. Schaffer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15033128) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 , and #21 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court are the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motions, finds they should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
July 19, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Apple Inc. (Ravel, J.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Kasey E. Koballa ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15028309) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Rishi Gupta ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15028294) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Amanda N. Brouillette ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15028279) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Mansi H. Shah ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15028260) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Alton L. Absher III ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15028233) by on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 & #16 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Before the Court are the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motions, finds they should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicants, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
June 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Ma for Seth R. Hasenour ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14930437) by on behalf of Scramoge Technology Limited. (Ma, Jonathan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Ma for Drew B. Hollander ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14930436) by on behalf of Scramoge Technology Limited. (Ma, Jonathan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett E Cooper on behalf of Scramoge Technology Limited. Attorney Brett E Cooper added to party Scramoge Technology Limited(pty:pla) (Cooper, Brett)
June 18, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 18, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. amending #1 Complaint,., filed by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Mirzaie, Reza)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright.
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. This Court, after considering Defendant Apple Inc.s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement (Unopposed Motion), is of the opinion that the Unopposed Motion should be granted. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendant Apple Inc.s Unopposed Motion is GRANTED, and Defendants deadline to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement is hereby extended through and including August 16, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ep4)
June 15, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 8/16/2021. (lad)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravel, J.)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Stephen Ravel on behalf of Apple Inc.. Attorney J. Stephen Ravel added to party Apple Inc.(pty:dft) (Ravel, J.)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scramoge Technology Limited. Apple Inc. served on 6/9/2021, answer due 6/30/2021. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (lad)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Brett E. Cooper. (lad)
June 8, 2021 All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)
June 7, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Scramoge Technology Limited (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14885334), filed by Scramoge Technology Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scramoge Technology Limited v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scramoge Technology Limited
Represented By: Drew B Hollander
Represented By: Seth Raymond Hasenour
Represented By: Brett E Cooper
Represented By: Brian D. Ledahl
Represented By: Christian W. Conkle
Represented By: James Milkey
Represented By: Jonathan Ma
Represented By: Marc A. Fenster
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Alton L. Absher, III
Represented By: Amanda N Brouillette
Represented By: Andrew W. Rinehart
Represented By: J Stephen Ravel
Represented By: Kasey Koballa
Represented By: Kelly Ransom
Represented By: Mansi H Shah
Represented By: Rishi Gupta
Represented By: Christopher P. Schaffer
Represented By: Steven D Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?