NetChoice, LLC v. Bonta
Plaintiff: NetChoice, LLC doing business as NetChoice
Defendant: Rob Bonta
Amicus Curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Eric Goldman, Chamber of Progress, IP Justice, LGBT Tech Institute and Computer & Communications Industry Association
Case Number: 5:2022cv08861
Filed: December 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO DECEMBER 7, 2023 (addressing #49 ). Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2023 11:00 AM in San Jose, Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/6/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2023)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Initial Case Management Conference filed by NetChoice, LLC and Rob Bonta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kumar, Ambika) (Filed on 4/3/2023) Modified on 4/4/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE #46 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CHANGE TIME; AND RESETTING HEARING FROM JUNE 22, 2023 TO JULY 27, 2023 AT 1:30 P.M. Hearing on #29 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 7/27/2023 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/10/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2023)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #46 MOTION to Change Time ) filed byNetChoice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ambika Kumar)(Kumar, Ambika) (Filed on 3/10/2023)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Change Time filed by Rob Bonta. Opposition due by 3/11/2023. No Reply. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth K. Watson ISO, #2 Declaration of Anya Binsacca ISO, #3 Proposed Order)(Watson, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/7/2023) Modified on 3/7/2023 (tsh, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to File amicus curiae brief filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(White, Lauren) (Filed on 3/3/2023)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #41 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Tamra Moore). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2023)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #40 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Christopher P. Eby). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2023)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Chamber of Progress, IP Justice, LGBT Tech Institute. Responses due by 3/15/2023. Replies due by 3/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brief of Amici Curiae Chamber of Progress, IP Justice, and LGBT Tech Institute in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Eby, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Tamra Moore ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18033981.) filed by Chamber of Progress, IP Justice, LGBT Tech Institute. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Moore, Tamra) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Christopher P. Eby ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18033922.) filed by Chamber of Progress, IP Justice, LGBT Tech Institute. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Eby, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE RELIEF REQUESTED IN #38 DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/28/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2023)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel and Request for Continuance by Rob Bonta (Watson, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/28/2023) Modified on 2/28/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #32 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Kathleen E. Scott). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/27/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #31 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Megan L. Brown). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/27/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #30 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Boyd Garriott). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/27/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Eric Goldman. Responses due by 3/10/2023. Replies due by 3/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief of Professor Eric Goldman as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff, #2 Proposed Order)(Harrison, Lindsay) (Filed on 2/24/2023)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and to Appear as Amicus Curiae (Unopposed) filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief of the Chamber of Commerce, #2 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Robert) (Filed on 2/24/2023)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (amicus) ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18013883.) filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scott, Kathleen) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (amicus) ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18013831.) filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Brown, Megan) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (amicus) ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18013573.) filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Garriott, Boyd) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by NetChoice, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/21/2023. Replies due by 5/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ambika Kumar, #2 Exhibit 1 to Kumar Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Kumar Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Kumar Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Kumar Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Kumar Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Kumar Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Kumar Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Kumar Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Kumar Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Kumar Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Kumar Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Kumar Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Kumar Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Kumar Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Kumar Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Kumar Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to Kumar Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 to Kumar Declaration, #20 Exhibit 19 to Kumar Declaration, #21 Declaration of Carl Szabo, #22 Declaration of Giancarlo Cairella, #23 Exhibit 1 to Cairella Declaration, #24 Exhibit 2 to Cairella Declaration, #25 Declaration of Libby Roin, #26 Exhibit 1 to Roin Declaration, #27 Exhibit 2 to Roin Declaration, #28 Declaration of Denise Paolucci, #29 Declaration of Michael Masnick, #30 Declaration of Stacie D. Rumenap, #31 Proposed Order)(Kumar, Ambika) (Filed on 2/17/2023)
January 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction is due on February 17, 2023 and is limited to 30 pages; Defendants response is due on April 21, 2023 and is limited to 30 pages; Plaintiffs reply is due on May 19, 2023 and is limited to 17 pages. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2023)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #27 STIPULATED REQUEST TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ENLARGE PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/26/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Joint Stipulation Proposing Briefing Schedule and Enlargement of Page Limits filed by NetChoice, LLC, Rob Bonta. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kumar, Ambika) (Filed on 1/24/2023) Modified on 1/25/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2023 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 1, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING #23 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/5/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Juliet Kau (Kau, Nicole) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Rob Bonta and NetChoice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watson, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/5/2023) Modified on 1/5/2023 (jml, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 1/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2023)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by NetChoice, LLC.. (Kumar, Ambika) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rob Bonta.. (Watson, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth K Watson (Watson, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. T here is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NetChoice, LLC. Rob Bonta served on 12/15/2022, answer due 1/5/2023. (Kumar, Ambika) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by NetChoice, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Wing, Other Affiliate Google, Other Affiliate Expedia, Inc., Other Affiliate Alibaba.com, Other Affiliate VeriSign, Other Affiliate Etsy Inc., Other Affiliate AOL, Other Affiliate eBay, Other Affiliate Turo, Other Affiliate Twitter, Other Affiliate Airbnb, Other Affiliate Yahoo!, Other Affiliate Lime, Other Affiliate Meta, Other Affiliate Fluid Truck, Other Affiliate HomeAway, Other Affiliate Hotels.com, Other Affiliate Lyft, Other Affiliate Nextdoor, Other Affiliate Oath, Other Affiliate OfferUp, Other Affiliate Orbitz, Other Affiliate PayPal, Other Affiliate Pinterest, Other Affiliate StubHub, Other Affiliate Swimply, Other Affiliate TikTok, Other Affiliate TravelTech, Other Affiliate Travelocity, Other Affiliate Trivago, Other Affiliate VRBO, Other Affiliate VSBLTY, Other Affiliate Waymo, Other Affiliate Amazon.com for NetChoice, LLC. (Sieff, Adam) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #8 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Meenakshi Krishnan, Counsel for Plaintiff NetChoice LLC. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/15/2022. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #6 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Robert Corn-Revere. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/15/2022. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #5 Application for Admission of Attorney for Pro Hac Vice for David Gossett, Counsel for Plaintiff Netchoice, LLC. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #4 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Ambika, Kumar, Counsel for Plaintiff NetChoice, LLC. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/15/2022. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Rob Bonta. (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by NetChoice, LLC (jml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17822658.) filed by NetChoice, LLC. (Krishnan, Meenakshi) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17820516.) filed by NetChoice, LLC. (Corn-Revere, Robert) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice David Gossett ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17820457.) filed by NetChoice, LLC. (Gossett, David) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17819607.) filed by NetChoice, LLC. (Kumar, Ambika) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by NetChoice, LLC (Sieff, Adam) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Sieff, Adam) (Filed on 12/14/2022)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Rob Bonta ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17819349.). Filed byNetChoice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sieff, Adam) (Filed on 12/14/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NetChoice, LLC v. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NetChoice, LLC doing business as NetChoice
Represented By: Ambika Kumar
Represented By: David Morris Gossett
Represented By: Meenakshi Krishnan
Represented By: Robert Corn-Revere
Represented By: Adam Stanley Sieff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Bonta
Represented By: Elizabeth K Watson
Represented By: Nicole Juliet Kau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Megan Leef Brown
Represented By: Robert Edward Dunn
Represented By: Boyd Garriott
Represented By: Kathleen Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Eric Goldman
Represented By: Lindsay C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Progress
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Eby
Represented By: Tamra Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: IP Justice
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Eby
Represented By: Tamra Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LGBT Tech Institute
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Eby
Represented By: Tamra Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Computer & Communications Industry Association
Represented By: Lauren Gallo White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?