Iliya v. City of Sunnyvale et al
Plaintiff: Dauda Iliya
Defendant: City of Sunnyvale, Sunnyvale Department of Public Safety, Sunnyvale Public Safety Department, Sunnyvale Police Services, Sunnyvale Police Department, Phan Ngo, Ava Fanucchi, Ashe and Mardesich
Case Number: 5:2023cv01249
Filed: March 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dauda Iliya. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2023)
March 23, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ashe, City of Sunnyvale, Ava Fanucchi, Mardesich, Phan Ngo, Sunnyvale Department of Public Safety, Sunnyvale Police Department, Sunnyvale Police Services. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2023)
March 21, 2023 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/4/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 17, 2023 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2023 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
March 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ashe, City of Sunnyvale, Ava Fanucchi, Mardesich, Phan Ngo, Sunnyvale Department of Public Safety, Sunnyvale Police Department, Sunnyvale Police Services, Sunnyvale Public Safety Department (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt #411017771.). Filed byDauda Iliya. Consent/Declination due by 3/31/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Filing fee receipt)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iliya v. City of Sunnyvale et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dauda Iliya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sunnyvale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyvale Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyvale Public Safety Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyvale Police Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyvale Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phan Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava Fanucchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mardesich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?