Gibson v. Stanford Health Care
Plaintiff: Davina Gibson
Defendant: Stanford Health Care
Case Number: 5:2023cv02320
Filed: May 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Certified copy of docket sheet and #25 remand order mailed to Santa Clara County Superior Court (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #10 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/9/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2023)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 5, 2023 HEARING ON #10 MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/29/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2023)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal J. Deckant (Deckant, Neal) (Filed on 9/27/2023)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING MOTION HEARING TO ZOOM WEBINAR HEARING and NOTICE OF REQUIRED REGISTRATION. Motion Hearing as to #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Davina Gibson set for 10/5/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at blfcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 10/3/2023, at 12:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2023)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER APPROVING #20 STIPULATION TO VACATE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE**AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT**. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2024 11:00 AM in San Jose, Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/18/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2023)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Vacating Case Management Conference filed by Davina Gibson. (Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 9/15/2023)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2023)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Ayres Horne (Horne, Emily) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Skye Scott (Scott, Brittany) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2023 11:00 AM (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2023)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Remand ) filed byDavina Gibson. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 7/7/2023)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STRIKING #13 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/28/2023. (blflc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY in Support (re #10 MOTION to Remand) filed by Davina Gibson. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 6/27/2023)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #11 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byStanford Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Remand) filed by Stanford Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Eisenberg)(Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand filed by Davina Gibson. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/21/2023. Replies due by 6/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 6/7/2023)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman n for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 5/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2023)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2023)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stanford Health Care.. (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 5/25/2023)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Stanford Health Care. (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 5/18/2023)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/26/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Stanford Health Care . (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Use Current Civil Cover Sheet. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Stanford Health Care (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2023)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stanford Health Care identifying Other Affiliate Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University for Stanford Health Care. (Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 5/11/2023)
May 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 23CV413522. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-18258092). Filed byStanford Health Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chow, Teresa) (Filed on 5/11/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Stanford Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davina Gibson
Represented By: L. Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Joshua David Arisohn
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Represented By: Brittany Skye Scott
Represented By: Emily Ayres Horne
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanford Health Care
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Represented By: Alexander Vitruk
Represented By: Dyanne Jinhyung Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?