Delacruz v. Tanimura & Antle, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Delacruz
Defendant: Tanimura & Antle, Inc., Mike Antle, Carmen Ponce and Claudia Quirarte
Case Number: 5:2023cv03034
Filed: June 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2023 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Further Status Report by Daniel Delacruz. (Delacruz, Daniel) (Filed on 8/12/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted (FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Claudia Quirarte. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 8/25/2023. Replies due by 9/1/2023. (Kanter, Scott) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 11, 2023 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Claudia Quirarte.. (Kanter, Scott) (Filed on 8/11/2023)
August 5, 2023 Filing 13 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byDaniel Delacruz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Declaration, #5 Supplement, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service, #9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Delacruz, Daniel) (Filed on 8/5/2023)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Continuing Motion Hearing and Directing Plaintiff to File Further Status Report. Plaintiff's further status report due by 8/31/2023. Motion Hearing re #7 motion to dismiss re-set for 9/26/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 7/31/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 28, 2023 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Daniel Delacruz. (Delacruz, Daniel) (Filed on 7/28/2023)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT. Joint status report due by 8/2/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 7/26/2023. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 26, 2023 #Electronic filing error. Electronic filing error re filer information. In the future please be sure to select all parties filing documents. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tanimura & Antle, Inc. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 25, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tanimura & Antle, Inc... (Barber, Stephan) (Filed on 7/25/2023)
July 25, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2023. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified text on 7/25/2023 (amk, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tanimura & Antle, Inc., Mike Antle, Carmen Ponce. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 8/7/2023. Replies due by 8/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul A. Rovella In Support of Motion to Dismiss and Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order)(Barber, Stephan) (Filed on 7/24/2023) Modified on 7/26/2023 correcting filer information (dhm, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2023 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Delacruz, Sr.. (Delacruz, Daniel) (Filed on 6/28/2023)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 21, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2023 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Daniel Delacruz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 21, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mike Antle, Carmen Ponce, Claudia Quirarte, Tanimura & Antle, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)
June 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Jury Demand; against Mike Antle, Carmen Ponce, Claudia Quirarte, Tanimura & Antle, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402., receipt #511019022) Filed by Daniel Delacruz. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delacruz v. Tanimura & Antle, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Delacruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanimura & Antle, Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Rovella
Represented By: Harrison Osaki
Represented By: Stephan Allen Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Antle
Represented By: Paul A. Rovella
Represented By: Harrison Osaki
Represented By: Stephan Allen Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Ponce
Represented By: Paul A. Rovella
Represented By: Harrison Osaki
Represented By: Stephan Allen Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Quirarte
Represented By: Scott R Kanter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?