Smith v. Google, LLC
Plaintiff: Mary L Smith, Mary L. Smith, Malissa Adams, Tracylyn Patterson, Cary Goldberg, Tyisha Sheppeard, Teresa Wright, Rheazene Taylor, Tiffany Layton, Jamila Armstrong and Monica Townsend
Defendant: Google, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Justin Hunt
Case Number: 5:2023cv03527
Filed: July 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
2 Judge: P Casey Pitts
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Anika Holland On Behalf Of Defendant Google LLC (Holland, Anika) (Filed on 11/14/2023)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 10/23/2023. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/23/2023)
October 20, 2023 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Google, LLC identifying Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc., Holding Company of Google LLC, Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Holding Company of XXVI Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Google LLC for Google, LLC. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 10/20/2023)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER THE HUNT CASE SHOULD BE SEVERED AND RELATED TO JUDGE PITTS FOR DETERMINATION re 22-cv-7557-SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/12/2023. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byJustin Hunt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harrison E. James, #2 Exhibit A - Original Complaint (Hunt v Meta, et al.), #3 Exhibit B - Email dated October 4, 2023, #4 Exhibit C - Email dated October 5, 2023, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 10, 2023 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #34 MOTION to Relate Case (to Consider Whether Hunt Case Should Severed and Related) by Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion)(Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 10/10/2023)
October 9, 2023 Filing 35 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Google, LLC. Filed by Monica Townsend, Tiffany Layton, Malissa Adams, Tracylyn Patterson, Rheazene Taylor, Mary L. Smith, Jamila Armstrong, Cary Goldberg, Tyisha Sheppeard, Teresa Wright. (Hoda, Marshal) (Filed on 10/9/2023)
October 6, 2023 Filing 34 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Malissa Adams, Jamila Armstrong, Cary Goldberg, Tiffany Layton, Tracylyn Patterson, Tyisha Sheppeard, Mary L. Smith, Rheazene Taylor, Monica Townsend, Teresa Wright. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel D. Smith, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Smith, Joel) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 6, 2023 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 10/6/2023)
October 5, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Yuhan Alice Chi On Behalf Of Defendant Google LLC (Chi, Yuhan) (Filed on 10/5/2023)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 *** See Attachment for CORRECTED MODIFIED ORDER granting #31 Order to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 9/6/2023. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 9/6/2023) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2023: #1 Corrected Order) (nmc, COURT USER). Modified text on 9/6/2023 (nmc, COURT USER).
September 6, 2023 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Malissa Adams, Mary L. Smith. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge P. Casey Pitts granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 28, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Marshal Hoda ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18590011.) filed by Mary L. Smith. (Hoda, Marshal) (Filed on 8/28/2023)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CONSOLIDATION ORDER re #27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Administratively Relate Cases Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 and Consolidate Related Actions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) filed by Mary L. Smith, Motions terminated: #27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Administratively Relate Cases Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 and Consolidate Related Actions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) filed by Mary L. Smith. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2023 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 08/24/2023. (nmc, COURT USER) (Filed on 8/25/2023)
August 23, 2023 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Administratively Relate Cases Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 and Consolidate Related Actions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a) filed by Mary L. Smith. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 8/23/2023)
August 22, 2023 Filing 26 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP (re Case No. 23-cv-03527-PCP). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/22/2023. (blflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2023)
August 21, 2023 Filing 25 Case Reassigned to Judge P. Casey Pitts. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (kab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2023)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable P. Casey Pitts in the San Jose Division for all further proceedings.1. All future filings shall bear the initials PCP immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Pitts by the moving party for a date consistent with the Courts law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff remain unchanged.5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after November 13, 2023, and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before November 13, 2023, are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines (e.g., motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice.8. On or before September 11, 2023, the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlined in the #Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District. The approved form for such statements can be accessed # here. A Joint Case Management Statement is not required in prisoner cases in which the prisoner plaintiff/petitioner is not represented by counsel. 9. Judge Pitts participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project; hearings and trials in civil cases are thus eligible for video recording upon request and with the consent of the parties and Judge Pitts. Please see the Court's #Pilot Project webpage and # General Order 65 for more information. IT IS SO ORDERED.Dated: 08/18/2023FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEEMark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 23 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #17 Summons Returned Executed to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Google, LLC. (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Naiara Toker obo Defendant Google LLC (Toker, Naiara) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Douglas Anderson obo Defendant Google LLC (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo E. Santacana obo Defendant Google LLC (Santacana, Eduardo) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Simona Alessandra Agnolucci obo Defendant Google LLC (Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 14, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Benedict Y. Hur obo Defendant Google LLC (Hur, Benedict) (Filed on 8/14/2023)
August 3, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary L. Smith. Google, LLC served on 8/1/2023, answer due 8/22/2023. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 8/3/2023)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/26/2023. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 26, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lori G. Feldman ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18485629.) filed by Mary L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing Lori G. Feldman)(Feldman, Lori) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/25/2023. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2023)
July 24, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18474837.) filed by Mary L. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Baxter-Kauf, Kate) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 21, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT.Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2023)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/20/2023. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Patrick Yarborough ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18465104.) filed by Mary L. Smith. (Yarborough, Patrick) (Filed on 7/20/2023)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remaina s referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2023)
July 18, 2023 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 18, 2023 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mary L. Smith.. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 18, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Liskow (Liskow, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Google, LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 17, 2023 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2023 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2023)
July 14, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2023. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2023)
July 14, 2023 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 7/14/2023)
July 14, 2023 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Google, LLC (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18452148.). Filed by Mary L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Joel) (Filed on 7/14/2023) Modified on 7/17/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Google, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L Smith
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary L. Smith
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malissa Adams
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracylyn Patterson
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Goldberg
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyisha Sheppeard
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Wright
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rheazene Taylor
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Layton
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamila Armstrong
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Townsend
Represented By: Joel Dashiell Smith
Represented By: Michael Liskow
Represented By: Neal J. Deckant
Represented By: Patrick Yarborough
Represented By: Marshal J. Hoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Represented By: Benedict Y. Hur
Represented By: Eduardo E. Santacana
Represented By: Simona Alessandra Agnolucci
Represented By: Joshua Douglas Anderson
Represented By: Naiara Toker
Represented By: Yuhan Alice Chi
Represented By: Anika Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Justin Hunt
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?