Patel v. Alphabet Inc.
Plaintiff: Raj Patel
Defendant: Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, United States of America A Governmental Entity and United States America
Case Number: 5:2023cv03647
Filed: July 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2023 Filing 38 USCA Case Number 23-16181 for #37 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Raj Patel. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2023)
September 13, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Raj Patel. Appeal of Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #31 , Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #34 (Appeal fee not paid). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)
September 13, 2023 Filing 36 Erroneous entry, please disregard. Refer to docket no. #37 . First MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by Raj Patel. Responses due by 9/27/2023. Replies due by 10/4/2023. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 9/13/2023) Modified on 9/13/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2023 Filing 35 Address Change Letter filed by Raj Patel. Responses due by 9/27/2023. Replies due by 10/4/2023. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 9/13/2023) Modified on 9/13/2023 (tsh, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/13/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING #32 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/13/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 12, 2023 Filing 33 PLAINTIFF RAJ K. PATELS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT AND OTHER DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT AND OTHER DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL AND AUTHENTICITY OF FACTS AND ALLEGATIONS OF CLAIMS AND DAMAGES IN EACH SUBMITTED COMPLAINT AND FINDING PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER ALPHABET INC. AND GOOGLE LLC re #32 Third MOTION for Reconsideration by Raj Patel. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 9/12/2023) Modified on 9/14/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION TO RECONSIDER AT DKT.31 - Third MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Raj Patel. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 9/8/2023)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #30 THIRD MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/8/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 8, 2023 Filing 30 AMENDED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT AND OTHER DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO FILE COMPLAINT AND OTHER DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL AND AUTHENTICITY OF FACTS AND ALLEGATIONS OF CLAIMS AND DAMAGES IN EACH SUBMITTED COMPLAINT - Third MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Raj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Patel, Raj) (Filed on 9/8/2023)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #28 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/7/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 7, 2023 Filing 28 Second MOTION for Reconsideration at Dkt. 26 filed by Raj Patel. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 9/7/2023) Modified on 9/11/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2023 Filing 27 Notice of Appeal from a Judgment or Order of a United States District Court - Renotice motion hearing re #21 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Raj Patel. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 9/6/2023) Modified on 9/11/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING #25 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/6/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 6, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Reconsider at Dkt. 24. Filed by Raj Patel. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 9/6/2023)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING #23 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/6/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 1, 2023 Filing 23 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #22 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, by Raj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 FAC Redacted, #5 FAC)(Patel, Raj) (Filed on 9/1/2023)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING #21 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/28/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 21, 2023 Filing 21 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Raj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Declaration, #3 Errata, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons)(Patel, Raj) (Filed on 8/21/2023)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SCREENING #18 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/8/2023. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING #17 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/7/2023. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 7, 2023 Filing 18 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America A Governmental Entity, Alphabet Inc., United States America, Google LLC. Filed by Raj Patel. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 8/7/2023) Modified on 8/8/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2023 Filing 17 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #16 Order, filed by Raj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Am. Compl.)(Patel, Raj) (Filed on 8/7/2023)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION TO RECONSIDER, GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, AND SCREENING #13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/7/2023. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 4, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Reconsider Dkt. #14 . Filed by Raj Patel. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 8/4/2023) Modified on 8/4/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/4/2023. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 2, 2023 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT under Order IGNORE Dkt. 12 against United States of America A Governmental Entity, Alphabet Inc., United States America, Google LLC. Filed byRaj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Summons MG Summons, #2 Summons Google Subpoena, #3 Summons USAO ND Cal Summons, #4 Summons US AG Summons, #5 Summons USAO ND Cal Subpoena, #6 Summons Alphabet Subpoena) (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 8/2/2023) Modified on 8/2/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2023 Filing 12 **Erroneous entry, please refer to docket no. #13 AMENDED COMPLAINT under Order against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, United States of America A Governmental Entity, United States America. Filed byRaj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Summons MG Subpoena, #2 Summons Google Subpeona, #3 Summons USAO ND Cal. Summons, #4 Summons MG Subpeona, #5 Summons USAO ND Cal. Summons, #6 Summons Alphabet Subpeona) (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 8/2/2023) Modified on 8/2/2023 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING #1 COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/28/2023. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 27, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2023)
July 26, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raj Patel re #8 Response Am. Cert. of Service (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 26, 2023 Filing 8 Response re #7 Letter in Opposition byRaj Patel. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 26, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Kelly M. Knoll on behalf of Defendants Google LLC and Alphabet Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Knoll, Kelly) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi remains as referral judge assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/26/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 26, 2023 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 26, 2023 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Raj Patel.. (Patel, Raj) (Filed on 7/26/2023)
July 24, 2023 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/17/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2023 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 24, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Raj Patel. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)
July 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Raj Patel. Consent/Declination due by 8/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2023)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Alphabet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raj Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Marie Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Kelly Marie Knoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America A Governmental Entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?