Vitale et al v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Francesco Vitale and Frances Vitale
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association, WT Capital Lender Services, Browning Law Group and Yvonne Ramirez-Browning
Case Number: 5:2023cv06019
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) [Reply to Non-Opposition] filed byWells Fargo Bank National Association. (Rackers, Mark) (Filed on 1/9/2024)
January 3, 2024 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARINGS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Motion Hearings as to #17 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint reset for 5/23/2024 09:00 AM and Initial Case Management Conference reset for 5/23/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (tsh, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2024: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2024 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) Joinder in Motion to Dismiss filed byBrowning Law Group, Yvonne Ramirez-Browning. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Browning, John) (Filed on 1/2/2024)
December 28, 2023 Filing 17 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by WT Capital Lender Services. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/15/2024 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. Responses due by 1/11/2024. Replies due by 1/18/2024. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hatmaker, Susan) (Filed on 12/28/2023)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/15/2023 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. Responses due by 1/2/2024. Replies due by 1/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zarndt, Anna Jane) (Filed on 12/19/2023)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #4 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/18/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2023: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING #5 MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/18/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2023: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #11 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATE FOR RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/1/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2023: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank National Association. re #10 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Rackers, Mark) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 11 Emergency ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION extension of time filed by Francesco Vitale. Responses due by 12/5/2023. (Vitale, Francesco) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
December 1, 2023 Filing 10 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ) Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief filed byWells Fargo Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Zarndt, Anna Jane) (Filed on 12/1/2023)
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 Proof of Service for service of judges order signed on 2023-11-22 served on all known defendants on 2023-11-28, filed by Francesco Vitale. (Vitale, Francesco) (Filed on 11/28/2023) Modified on 11/29/2023 (kmg, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING NOTICE OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING RESPONSE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/22/23. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2023: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tsh, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2024 at 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 21, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Frances Vitale, Francesco Vitale. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Declaratory Relief, filed by Frances Vitale, Francesco Vitale. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for All Hearings for this Court, filed by Frances Vitale, Francesco Vitale. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank Vitale. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Browning Law Group, Yvonne Ramirez-Browning, WT Capital Lender Services, Wells Fargo Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Wells Fargo Bank, #2 WT Capital)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt 511019093). Filed by Frank Vitale, Frances Vitale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G, #2 Exhibits H-I, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K part 1, #5 Exhibit K part 2, #6 Exhibit L, #7 Receipt)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2023) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2023: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (wsn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vitale et al v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francesco Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Mark Gerard Rackers
Represented By: Anna Jane Irene Zarndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WT Capital Lender Services
Represented By: Susan King Hatmaker
Represented By: Robert William Branch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Browning Law Group
Represented By: John Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Ramirez-Browning
Represented By: John Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?