eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. v. PayPal Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.
Defendant: PayPal Holdings, Inc and PayPal Inc
Case Number: 5:2024cv01054
Filed: February 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Filing 87 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2024)
February 22, 2024 Filing 86 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 7:22-cv-00245. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 19, 2024 Filing 85 Redacted Copy of #79 Sealed Motion PLAINTIFF ECARDLESS BANCORP LTDS OPPOSED MOTION TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sur-Reply)(Robinson, Erick)
February 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #19 WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING Defendants PayPal Holdings, Inc.'s 12(b)(3) And PayPal, Inc.'s (12)(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Complaint in light of the Court's Order granting PayPal's Motion to Transfer Venue (ECF No. 82). Entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jplc)
February 16, 2024 Filing 84 NOTICE of Intent to File Objections to and Move for Reconsideration of February 15, 2024 Transfer Order by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. re #82 Sealed Order,, (Robinson, Erick)
February 15, 2024 Filing 83 Sealed Document: Plaintiff Ecardless Bancorp, LTD.'s Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California (je3)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Sealed Order Granting Paypal's Motion to Transfer Venue [ECF No. 39], Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike [ECF No. 41], Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply [ECF No. 79]. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. The Movant shall email a redacted PDF version of the Court's sealed order for publication within seven (7) days after the Court enters the sealed order to the Court's Law Clerks at txwdml_nojudge_chambers_wa_judgegilliland@txwd.uscourts.gov. If a redacted version is not received, the document will otherwise become public (je3) Modified on 2/15/2024 (je3).
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING #75 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amelia R. Garza-Mattia for PayPal, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (ad3)
February 9, 2024 Filing 80 Redacted Copy of Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1404(a) of #77 Sealed Document,, by PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit P)(Kang, Robert)
February 9, 2024 Filing 79 Sealed Motion PLAINTIFF ECARDLESS BANCORP LTDS OPPOSED MOTION TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. Referral Judge: Derek T. Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Bear, #2 Exhibit 1 - Sur-Reply, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order to Motion to Strike, #9 Proposed Order to Motion to File Sur-Reply) (Robinson, Erick)
February 2, 2024 Filing 78 STATUS REPORT Regarding Motion to Transfer by PayPal, Inc.. (Kang, Robert)
February 2, 2024 Filing 77 Sealed Document: Defendants' Reply In Support of Its Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) of #39 Sealed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1404(A) by PayPal, Inc. by PayPal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert N. Kang, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S) (Kang, Robert)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Sealed ORDER ON JANUARY 22, 2024, DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Parties shall email a redacted PDF version of the Court's sealed order for publication within seven (7) days after the Court enters the sealed order to the Court's Law Clerks at txwdml_nojudge_chambers_wa_judgegilliland@txwd.uscourts.gov. If a redacted version is not received, the document will otherwise become public. (lad) Unsealed on 2/1/2024. Per chambers, order is to be unsealed due to no redactions by counsel. (lad).
January 23, 2024 Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #Standing Order Governing Proceedings - Patent Cases available by clicking the hyperlink. (bot1)
January 19, 2024 Filing 75 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert N. Kang for Amelia R. Garza-Mattia ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18324783) by on behalf of PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Kang, Robert)
January 12, 2024 Filing 74 Sealed Document: Plaintiff eCardless Bancorp, LTD.'s Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California and Alternative Request for Transfer to Austin Division of #39 Sealed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1404(A) by PayPal, Inc. by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Erick Robinson, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Brian Medich, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 41, #41 Exhibit 42, #42 Exhibit 43) (Robinson, Erick)
January 2, 2024 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyril Talanov on behalf of eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. Attorney Kyril Talanov added to party eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.(pty:pla) (Talanov, Kyril)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING #70 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Cancelling Discovery Hearing Via Zoom. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
December 1, 2023 Filing 70 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines [FOURTH] by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Setting Zoom Discovery for 12/8/2023 02:00 PM before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bot2)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ON NOVEMBER 10, 2023, DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
November 21, 2023 Filing 67 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Robinson, Erick)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jayme Partidge for eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #64 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
November 9, 2023 Filing 64 Third MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines filed Jointly by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ON OCTOBER 25, 2023, DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
November 3, 2023 Filing 62 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson (on behalf of Jayme Partridge) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18062353) by on behalf of eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
November 1, 2023 Filing 61 Reply Claim Construction Brief by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Robinson, Erick)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian T. Bear for eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (kg)
October 20, 2023 Filing 59 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson of BRIAN T. BEAR ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-18011606) by on behalf of eCardless Bancorp, Ltd... Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
October 18, 2023 Filing 58 STATUS REPORT Defendant's Status Report Regarding Motion to Transfer by PayPal, Inc.. (Shelton, Barry)
October 18, 2023 Filing 57 Reply Claim Construction Brief by PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert N. Kang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Shelton, Barry)
October 13, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Gregory Strand on behalf of eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. Attorney Brian Gregory Strand added to party eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.(pty:pla) (Strand, Brian)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Devin P. Garrity for PayPal, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
October 4, 2023 Filing 54 Reply Claim Construction Brief by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Robinson, Erick)
September 27, 2023 Filing 53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert N. Kang for Devin P. Garrity ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17928639) by on behalf of PayPal, Inc... Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Kang, Robert)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #48 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
September 21, 2023 Filing 51 Redacted Copy of #45 Sealed Document,, by PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert N. Kang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Kang, Robert)
September 19, 2023 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd., re #41 MOTION to Strike #39 Sealed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1404(A) by PayPal, Inc. filed by Plaintiff eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Healey, Danielle)
September 19, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle Joy Healey on behalf of eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. Attorney Danielle Joy Healey added to party eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.(pty:pla) (Healey, Danielle)
September 19, 2023 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Healey, Danielle)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sadaf Ali Deedar for eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (slt)
September 14, 2023 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to Stay Venue Discovery and Briefing Deadlines Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order TAKING UNDER ADVISEMENT #41 MOTION to Strike by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd., ECF No. 39 Sealed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1404(a) by PayPal, Inc., entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. The Court takes the motion to strike under advisement and the motion to strike is held in abeyance pending further order of the Court or the resolution of the motion to transfer, expect as otherwise stated here: as the Court stated in the text order of September 8, 2023, eCardless may file a reply limited to 5 pages in support of its motion to strike by no later than 7 days after the filing of PayPal's response. In the meantime, the parties are directed to engage in venue or jurisdictional briefing and discovery. Venue or jurisdictional discovery shall be completed no later than 10 weeks after the filing of defendant PayPal's motion to transfer at ECF No. 39. The deadline for plaintiff eCardless's response is 2 weeks after the completion of venue or jurisdictional discovery. The deadline for PayPal's reply is 2 weeks after the filing of the response. The following presumptive limits on discovery related to venue and jurisdiction apply: each party is limited to 5 interrogatories, 10 Requests for Production, and 10 hours of deposition testimony. The time to respond to such discovery requests is 20 days. If a party believes these limits should be expanded, the party shall meet and confer with opposing counsel and if an impasse is reached, the requesting party is directed to contact the Court's law clerk for a telephonic hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jplc)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #46 Motion to Stay entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. The parties are directed to engage in venue or jurisdictional briefing and discovery as stated in the Court's previous text order of September 14, 2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jplc)
September 13, 2023 Filing 45 Sealed Document: Defendant PayPal Inc.'s Response to eCardless's Motion to Strike Defendant PayPal's Opposed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California of #41 MOTION to Strike #39 Sealed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1404(A) by PayPal, Inc. by PayPal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert N. Kang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order) (Kang, Robert)
September 11, 2023 Filing 44 Redacted Copy of #39 Sealed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1404(A) by PayPal, Inc. by PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rachel Krantz, #2 Affidavit Robert N. Kang, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Errata S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Errata U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB)(Kang, Robert)
September 8, 2023 Filing 43 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by PayPal, Inc., re #42 Opposed MOTION to Expedite P's MOTION to Strike (ECF No. 39) filed by Plaintiff eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order DENYING #42 Opposed Motion to Expedite eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.'s motion to strike entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Paypal, Inc.'s response to the motion to strike filed by eCardless, ECF No. 41, must be filed not later than September 13, 2023. W.D. Tex. Loc. R. CV-7(d) (7 days after the filing of the motion). PayPal is authorized to use 15 pages for its response to eCardless's motion to strike, exclusive of the caption, the signature block, any certificate, and any accompanying documents. eCardless may file a reply limited to 5 pages in support of its motion to strike by no later than 7 days after the filing of the response. W.D. Tex. Loc. R. CV-7(e). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jplc)
September 6, 2023 Filing 42 Opposed MOTION to Expedite P's MOTION to Strike (ECF No. 39) by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
September 6, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Strike #39 Sealed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1404(A) by PayPal, Inc. by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of E. Robinson, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
September 6, 2023 Filing 40 Opening Claim Construction Brief by PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert N. Kang, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Shelton, Barry)
September 1, 2023 Filing 39 Sealed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1404(A) by PayPal, Inc.. Referral Judge: Derek T. Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rachel Krantz, #2 Affidavit Robert N. Kang, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB) (Kang, Robert)
August 31, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Medich on behalf of eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. Attorney Brian Medich added to party eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.(pty:pla) (Medich, Brian)
August 28, 2023 Filing 37 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17777888) by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (jb3)
August 16, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson of Sadaf Ali Deedar ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17777888) by on behalf of eCardless Bancorp, Ltd... Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Robinson, Erick)
August 16, 2023 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson of Sadaf Ali Deedar ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17777888) (Incorrect header please include Midland/Odessa Division) (je3)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #34 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Markman Hearing set for 11/8/2023 01:30 PM in Waco before Judge Alan D Albright, Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2024, Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2023, Motions due by 8/14/2024 Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (je3)
June 16, 2023 Filing 34 Agreed MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Shelton, Barry)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge David Counts no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
April 28, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Referral Judge: Derek T. Gilliland. (kg)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2024 at 01:30 PM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 12/2/2024 at 08:00 AM in Midland before Judge David Counts, Motions due by 7/31/2024. Signed by Judge David Counts. (slt)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by Judge David Counts. (kg)
April 27, 2023 Filing 30 Proposed Scheduling Order filed Jointly by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Robinson, Erick)
April 4, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick M. Dunn on behalf of eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. Attorney Patrick M. Dunn added to party eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.(pty:pla) (Dunn, Patrick)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within thirty (30) days after the appearance of any defendant. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #27 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion Requesting Order for Scheduling Recommendations. The Court will issue its order for scheduling recommendations by separate order. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
April 2, 2023 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION (REQUESTING ORDER FOR SCHEDULING RECOMMENDATIONS) by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Robinson, Erick)
March 31, 2023 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc., re #19 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant PayPal Holdings, Inc., Defendant PayPal, Inc. (Shelton, Barry)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #25 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. It is ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to file its reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is extended to March 31, 2023. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
March 21, 2023 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 Response in Opposition to Motion by PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Barry)
March 17, 2023 Filing 24 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd., re #19 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT PAYPAL HOLDINGS, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by Plaintiff eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. (Bains, Bradley) Modified on 3/23/2023 (kg).
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT PAYPAL HOLDINGS, INC. Signed by Judge David Counts. (je3)
March 14, 2023 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT PAYPAL HOLDINGS, INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Robinson, Erick) Modified on 3/17/2023 (je3).
February 28, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Erick)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED the Plaintiff's time to answer or otherwise respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is extended to March 17, 2023. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
February 17, 2023 Filing 20 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PayPal Holdings, Inc. for PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc.. (Shelton, Barry)
February 17, 2023 Filing 19 CORRECTED MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert N. Kang-CORRECTED, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Robert N. Kang, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Robert N. Kang, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Robert N. Kang, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Robert N. Kang, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Connor Kosnick)(Shelton, Barry)
February 17, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Kang on behalf of PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc. (Kang, Robert)
February 17, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc. (Shelton, Barry)
February 17, 2023 Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #14 Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) (je3)
February 17, 2023 Filing 15 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (je3)
February 17, 2023 Filing 14 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent PayPal Holdings, Inc. for PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc.. (Shelton, Barry)
February 17, 2023 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #10 Notice of Appearance (je3)
February 17, 2023 Filing 12 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #9 Notice of Appearance, (je3)
February 17, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kang Declaration ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 to Kang Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Kang Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Kang Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Kang Declaration, #6 Affidavit Affidavit of Connor Kosnik ISO Motion to Dismiss)(Shelton, Barry)
February 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Kang on behalf of PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc.. Attorney Robert N. Kang added to party PayPal Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert N. Kang added to party PayPal, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kang, Robert)
February 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry K. Shelton on behalf of PayPal Holdings, Inc., PayPal, Inc.. Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party PayPal Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Barry K. Shelton added to party PayPal, Inc.(pty:dft) (Shelton, Barry)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Andrew W. Lester's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice Pro Hac Vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our Court within 10 days of this Order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. It is further ORDERED that if Mr. Lester has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Court Rule AT-1(f)(2). Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Erick Scott Robinson of Andrew Lester ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-17044590) by on behalf of eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Robinson, Erick)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time as to PayPal Holdings, Inc. answer due 2/17/2023; PayPal, Inc. answer due 2/17/2023. Signed by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (sg)
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION OF UNOPPOSED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. (Robinson, Erick) Modified event type on 1/6/2023 (sg).
December 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. PayPal Holdings, Inc. served on 12/12/2022, answer due 1/3/2023; PayPal, Inc. served on 12/12/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Robinson, Erick)
December 2, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (kg)
November 23, 2022 Case assigned to Judge David Counts pursuant to the Order Assigning Business of the Court as it Relates to Patent Cases, filed 7/25/2022. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kg)
November 23, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Robinson, Erick)
November 23, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Robinson, Erick)
November 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16786030), filed by eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Robinson, Erick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: eCardless Bancorp, Ltd. v. PayPal Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: eCardless Bancorp, Ltd.
Represented By: Brian T. Bear
Represented By: Jayme Partridge
Represented By: Sadaf Ali Deedar
Represented By: Bradley H. Bains, X
Represented By: Brian Medich
Represented By: Brian Gregory Strand
Represented By: Danielle Joy Healey
Represented By: Kyril Talanov
Represented By: Patrick M. Dunn
Represented By: Erick Scott Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Represented By: Robert N. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal Inc
Represented By: Barry K. Shelton
Represented By: Devin P. Garrity
Represented By: Amelia R. Garza-Mattia
Represented By: Nimalka R. Wickramasekera
Represented By: Robert N. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?