WirelessWerx IP, LLC v. Lyft, Inc.
Plaintiff: WirelessWerx IP, LLC
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv01144
Filed: February 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: As discussed at the April 23, 2024 case management conference, by April 30, 2024 plaintiff's counsel Mr. William Ramey shall file an application for admission pro hac vice. It is so ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/23/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
April 23, 2024 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2024 via Zoom Webinar.Court to issue order.Plaintiff Attorney: William Ramey. Defendant Attorney: Jeremy Taylor, Lute Yang. Court Report: Digital Recording Zoom recording: 2:00-2:15 p.m. Total: 15 Minutes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2024)
April 23, 2024 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME OF HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2024 at 01:30 PM is RESET to 02:00 PM in San Jose - Videoconference Only - Zoom Webinar.Please see docket 52 for Zoom Webinar link information. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
April 17, 2024 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO ZOOM WEBINAR CONFERENCE and NOTICE OF REQUIRED REGISTRATION.Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2024 01:30 PM - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkd Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails specifying main speaker(s) must be sent to the CRD at VKDcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 4/19/2024 at 1:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2024)
April 16, 2024 Filing 51 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT [Corrected] Case Management Conference Statement filed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 4/16/2024)
April 16, 2024 Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Initial Joint Case Management Statement filed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 4/16/2024)
April 16, 2024 Filing 49 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Case Management Conference Statement filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/16/2024)
April 9, 2024 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan S.Q. Kalra (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 4/9/2024)
April 9, 2024 Filing 47 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by WirelessWerx IP, LLC.. (Kalra, Susan) (Filed on 4/9/2024)
April 2, 2024 Filing 46 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Lyft, Inc. (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/2/2024)
March 21, 2024 Filing 45 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2024. Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/23/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Jose - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/vkdorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2024)
March 21, 2024 Filing 44 CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 4/4/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2024)
March 13, 2024 Filing 43 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 3/20/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2024)
March 12, 2024 Filing 42 RESPONSE re #33 Reply Memorandum Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) [Dkt. No. 28] by Lyft, Inc.. (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/12/2024)
March 12, 2024 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lyft, Inc. (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/12/2024)
March 12, 2024 Filing 40 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lyft, Inc... (Taylor, Jeremy) (Filed on 3/12/2024)
March 6, 2024 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Lute Yang for Defendant Lyft, Inc. (Yang, Lute) (Filed on 3/6/2024)
February 27, 2024 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/12/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2024)
February 26, 2024 Filing 37 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2024)
February 26, 2024 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 6:22-cv-01058. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #27 Sealed UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER. The case is to be TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (lad)
February 23, 2024 Reset Answer Deadlines: Lyft, Inc. answer due 3/12/2024. Defendant's deadline to reply is hereby extended to March 12, 2024. (cav)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Defendant's deadline to reply is hereby extended to March 12, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
February 22, 2024 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Salpietra, Bethany)
February 20, 2024 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC, re #28 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Lyft, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
February 19, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO TRANSFER VENUE by WirelessWerx IP, LLC re #27 Sealed Motion filed (Ramey, William)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #31 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #28 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Response is extended to February 16, 2024. Entered by Judge David Counts. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db)
February 5, 2024 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Ramey, William)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #30 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 Redacted Copy, #27 Sealed Motion filed entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. The Deadline to Respond is now February 16, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
February 2, 2024 Filing 30 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #29 Redacted Copy, #27 Sealed Motion filed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Ramey, William)
January 26, 2024 Filing 29 Redacted Copy of Sealed Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Lyft, Inc. of #27 Sealed Motion filed by Lyft, Inc.. (Salpietra, Bethany)
January 22, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bethany R. Salpietra, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Salpietra, Bethany)
January 22, 2024 Filing 27 Sealed Motion filed: DEFENDANT LYFT, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Referral Judge: Derek T. Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Maryana Madorsky, #2 Proposed Order) (zv)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #25 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. The Clerk is directed to file the Motion and exhibits onto the docket under seal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
January 19, 2024 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #25 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document Declaration of Bethany R. Salpietra in Support of Sealed Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Salpietra, Bethany)
January 19, 2024 Filing 25 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Referral Judge: Derek T. Gilliland. (Attachments: #1 Brief Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California, #2 Affidavit of Maryana Madorsky, #3 Proposed Order) (Salpietra, Bethany)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint is HEREBY EXTENDED until January 22, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
December 21, 2023 Reset Deadlines: Lyft, Inc. answer due 1/22/2024. (zv)
December 20, 2023 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint, by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Villarreal, Jose)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FIRST SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 10/4/2024 09:00 AM before Judge David Counts. Joinder of Parties due by 11/15/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 12/12/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2026 before Judge David Counts. Jury Selection set for 3/6/2026 before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Jury Trial set for 3/6/2026 before Judge David Counts. Motions terminated: #22 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (zv)
December 11, 2023 Filing 22 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Ramey, William)
December 8, 2023 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lyft, Inc. amending #1 , filed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E)(Ramey, William) Modified on 12/11/2023 to link to original complaint (zv).
November 15, 2023 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Derek T. Gilliland: Case called for an Initial Hearing Held In Person. Parties announced ready. Statements and arguments of counsel heard. The Court went over docket management procedures and set the Markman date of February 28, 2024 at 2pm. Parties are to email a word version of the Proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's Law Clerk at Mark_Scott@txwd.uscourts.gov and file it as a Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order on the case. Hearing concluded. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR.)(lad)
November 15, 2023 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT [Corrected] Case Readiness Status Report by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
November 14, 2023 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT [Corrected] Case Readiness Status Report by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT Case Readiness Status Report by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IN PERSON. INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE reset for 11/15/2023 03:00 PM (time change only) before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (zv)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IN PERSON. INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE set for 11/15/2023 01:30 PM (30 min time block) before Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (cv)
January 9, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
December 19, 2022 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Parties by Lyft, Inc.. (Salpietra, Bethany)
December 19, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Lyft, Inc. by Lyft, Inc..(Salpietra, Bethany)
December 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy J. Taylor on behalf of Lyft, Inc.. Attorney Jeremy J. Taylor added to party Lyft, Inc.(pty:dft) (Taylor, Jeremy)
December 1, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bethany Rose Salpietra on behalf of Lyft, Inc.. Attorney Bethany Rose Salpietra added to party Lyft, Inc.(pty:dft) (Salpietra, Bethany)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, entered by Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Lyft is to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 19,2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mslc)
November 2, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Lyft, Inc. answer due 12/19/2022. (lad)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Lyft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (Villarreal, Jose)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jose Carlos Villarreal on behalf of Lyft, Inc.. Attorney Jose Carlos Villarreal added to party Lyft, Inc.(pty:dft) (Villarreal, Jose)
October 13, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. Lyft, Inc. served on 10/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022. (Ramey, William)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order and Advisory, referring case to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge David Counts. (sm3) Modified to unseal on 10/13/2022 (lad).
October 12, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (sm3)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lyft, Inc.. (sm3)
October 7, 2022 Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. Assigned due to Related Cases. (sm3)
October 7, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Ramey, William)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16613887), filed by WirelessWerx IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A US7317927, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WirelessWerx IP, LLC v. Lyft, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WirelessWerx IP, LLC
Represented By: William P. Ramey, III
Represented By: Susan S.Q. Kalra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft, Inc.
Represented By: Jose Carlos Villarreal
Represented By: Bethany Salpietra
Represented By: Jeremy J Taylor
Represented By: Lute Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?