Esalen Institute v. First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company and First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Petitioner: Esalen Institute
Case Number: 7:2019cv05826
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Mauricio Alfredo Gonzalez (Gonzalez, Mauricio) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. (AIG) for Lexington Insurance Company. (Ruby, Samuel) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. (AIG) for Lexington Insurance Company. (Ruby, Samuel) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/9/2019. Replies due by 10/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mauricio Gonzalez, #2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Mauricio Gonzalez, #3 Exhibit B to Decl. of Mauricio Gonzalez, #4 Exhibit C to Decl. of Mauricio Gonzalez, #5 Exhibit D to Decl. of Mauricio Gonzalez, #6 Affidavit of Mark Simpson, #7 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Mark Simpson, #8 Proposed Order)(Hudson, Eliot) (Filed on 9/25/2019) Modified on 9/26/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 Amended Notice of Reassignment. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/25/2019 ***amendment to #13 Modified on 9/25/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 9/25/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 *** CLERK'S ERROR *** please see #14 Amended Reassignment Order. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/25/2019 . (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) Modified on 9/25/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 9/25/2019, (typographical error) (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 <*** Docketed in Error. Please Disregard. See Docket #13 *** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) Modified on 9/25/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by First Specialty Insurance Corporation.. (Hudson, Eliot) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by First Specialty Insurance Corporation.. (Hudson, Eliot) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to Removal Complaint (see dkt 6 Exhibit 1 of Removal Complaint) by Lexington Insurance Company. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (correction to dkt #1 Notice of Removal) from Monterey County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV002462. (). Filed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hudson, Eliot) (Filed on 9/18/2019) Modified on 9/20/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/20/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by First Specialty Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Swiss Re Ltd. for First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Hudson, Eliot) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by First Specialty Insurance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Swiss Re Ltd. for First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Hudson, Eliot) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Eliot Hudson in Support of #1 Notice of Removal filed byFirst Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hudson, Eliot) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by First Specialty Insurance Corporation . (Hudson, Eliot) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monterey County Superior Court. Their case number is 19CV002462. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13714775). Filed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Hudson, Eliot) (Filed on 9/18/2019) Modified on 9/20/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 9/25/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esalen Institute v. First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Specialty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Eliot Reeve Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Esalen Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?