Mevorah v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jason Mevorah, Genaro Perez and Perry Derrick
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., Wells Fargo Mortgage Company and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: M:2006cv01770
Filed: June 27, 2006
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: MDL Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2009 311 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PAGE LIMIT EXTENSION AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OPPOSITION BRIEF. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/5/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
September 11, 2009 304 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for filing of plaintiffs' certification brief to and including 9/15/2009, and page limitation increased to 35 pages; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/11/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
August 5, 2009 300 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/3/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
December 4, 2008 281 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference continued to 2/2/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/2/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
October 22, 2008 272 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER ENJOINING CALIFORNIA CLASS MEMBERS FROM EX PARTE CONTACT WITH COUNSEL FOR MICHAEL HOLLANDER; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/22/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
September 10, 2008 251 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ENJOINING CALIFORNIA CLASS MEMBERS FROM PARTICIPATING IN QUESTIONNAIRE INS STRICKLER CASE; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/10/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mevorah v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Mevorah
Represented By: Ashlea Gayle Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genaro Perez
Represented By: Robert Walter Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Derrick
Represented By: Ashlea Gayle Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Richard H. Rahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Mortgage Company
Represented By: Richard H. Rahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Richard H. Rahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?